Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3179942

EP3179942 - FLEXIBLE PLATE FIXATION OF BONE FRACTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.08.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zimmer, Inc.
1800 W. Center Street
Warsaw, Indiana 46580 / US
[2017/25]
Inventor(s)01 / BOTTLANG, Michael
12346 SE Cougar Place
Happy Valley, Oregon 97086 / US
02 / MADEY, Steven M.
58960 SW Petes Mountain Road
West Linn, Oregon 97068 / US
03 / WIRTZ, Kyle
6316 SE 70th Avenue
Portland, Oregon 97206 / US
04 / TSAI, Stanley
7824 SW Oleson Rd
Portland, Oregon 97233 / US
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Mays, Julie , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London, EC1A 4HD / GB
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date15745735.924.07.2015
[2017/25]
WO2015US42057
Priority number, dateUS201462029168P25.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462029168 P
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016014977
Date:28.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3179942
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B17/80
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
TitleGerman:FLEXIBLE PLATTENFIXIERUNG VON KNOCHENBRÜCHEN[2017/25]
English:FLEXIBLE PLATE FIXATION OF BONE FRACTURES[2017/25]
French:FIXATION DE PLAQUE SOUPLE DE FRACTURES OSSEUSES[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2017National basic fee paid 
27.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
27.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
19.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2012310289  (BOTTLANG MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-14,16,20 * figures 2-7,13,16,18; claims 1-33 * [I] 7,15;
 [XI]WO2013116642  (GENESIS FRACTURE CARE INC [US]) [X] 1-5,9-14,20 * the whole document * [I] 7,8,15,16;
 [I]US2012277746  (MORGAN ROBERT L [GB], et al) [I] 1-9,15-20 * paragraphs [0053] - [0068] - [0094] - [0096] - [0101]; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US6540746  (BUEHLER DANIEL W [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1926445  (UNIVERSITAETSKLINIKUM FREIBURG [DE]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *