Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3155767

EP3155767 - INSTANT MESSAGING GROUP POLLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  16.03.2018
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.03.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2018Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 18.04.2018  [2018/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2017/16]
Inventor(s)01 / ATAMEL, Mete
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / CINQUILLI, Mattia
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / COLANTONIO, Luca
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2017/16]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/16]
Application number, filing date15748124.324.07.2015
[2017/16]
WO2015US41895
Priority number, dateGB2014001351330.07.2014         Original published format: GB 201413513
US20141449880226.09.2014         Original published format: US201414498802
[2017/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016018735
Date:04.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3155767
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/58, G06F17/24
[2017/16]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/16]
TitleGerman:GRUPPENUMFRAGEN IN DER SOFORTIGEN NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNG[2017/16]
English:INSTANT MESSAGING GROUP POLLS[2017/16]
French:INTERROGATIONS DE GROUPE DE MESSAGERIE INSTANTANÉE[2017/16]
Entry into regional phase10.01.2017National basic fee paid 
10.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
10.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/16]
10.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2018Application withdrawn by applicant  [2018/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[I]US2008189620  (BONFORTE JEFFREY [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0051]; figures 1-4 *;
 [I]US2005065632  (DOUGLIS FREDERICK [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1,4,5,8,11 *;
 [I]US2008147803  (KRZYZANOWSKI PAUL [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0075]; figures 1,2,9-10 *;
 [I]US2013055112  (JOSEPH ARNON [IL], et al) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0515] - paragraph [0562]; figures 18,24 *;
 [I]EP1624613  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0053]; figures 2,3,7-9 *