Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3175432

EP3175432 - OPERATING UNIT AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTROMOTIVE ADJUSTING DRIVE OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.03.2019
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/23]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2017/23]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/23]
Application number, filing date15748209.228.07.2015
[2017/23]
WO2015EP67280
Priority number, dateDE20141011095601.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014110956
[2017/23]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016016245
Date:04.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3175432
Date:07.06.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016
[2017/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G08C17/00
[2017/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/23]
TitleGerman:BEDIENEINHEIT UND STEUERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN VERSTELLANTRIEB EINES MÖBELS[2017/23]
English:OPERATING UNIT AND CONTROL SYSTEM FOR AN ELECTROMOTIVE ADJUSTING DRIVE OF A PIECE OF FURNITURE[2017/23]
French:UNITÉ DE COMMANDE ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE POUR ENTRAÎNEMENT DE RÉGLAGE ÉLECTROMOTEUR D'UN MEUBLE[2017/23]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2017National basic fee paid 
28.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/23]
28.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XYI]DE202007011340U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS SYSTEMTECH [DE]) [X] 1,5,8,9,16,17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0045] * [Y] 10-15,18 [I] 2-4;
 [XYI]US2010007307  (BAARMAN DAVID W [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-7 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0053] * [Y] 10-15,18 [I] 3