Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3183695

EP3183695 - KNOWLEDGE-GRAPH BIASED CLASSIFICATION FOR DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.08.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / MAJUMDAR, Somdeb
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / TOWAL, Regan Blythe
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / TALATHI, Sachin Subhash
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
04 / JULIAN, David Jonathan
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
05 / ANNAPUREDDY, Venkata Sreekanta Reddy
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15748396.728.07.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015US42488
Priority number, dateUS201462039329P19.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462039329 P
US20141452889030.10.2014         Original published format: US201414528890
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016028446
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3183695
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06N3/04, G06N7/00
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:WISSENSGRAFIKBASIERTE KLASSIFIZIERUNG FÜR DATEN[2017/26]
English:KNOWLEDGE-GRAPH BIASED CLASSIFICATION FOR DATA[2017/26]
French:CLASSIFICATION DE DONNÉES INFLUENCÉE PAR UN GRAPHE DE CONNAISSANCES[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2017National basic fee paid 
06.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.06.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
06.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
03.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.05.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]  - R. SOCHER ET AL, "Reasoning with neural tensor networks for knowledge base completion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 27TH ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING SYSTEMS (NIPS'26), (20131205), ISBN 978-1-63266-024-4, pages 926 - 935, XP055235569 [I] 12-24 * sections 3 and 4 *
 [I]  - A. BORDES ET AL, "A semantic matching energy function for learning with multi-relational data", MACHINE LEARNING, (20130530), vol. 94, no. 2, doi:10.1007/s10994-013-5363-6, pages 233 - 259, XP055235389 [I] 12-24 * section 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10994-013-5363-6
 [I]  - C. FARABET ET AL, "Learning hierarchical features for scene labeling", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (20121017), vol. 35, no. 8, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2012.231, pages 1915 - 1929, XP011515324 [I] 12-24 * sections 1, 3 and 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPAMI.2012.231
 [I]  - H. MYEONG ET AL, "Learning object relationships via graph-based context model", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2012 IEEE CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION (CVPR'12), (20120616), doi:10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247995, pages 2727 - 2734, XP032208920 [I] 12-24 * section 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.2012.6247995
 [I]  - A. QUEK ET AL, "Structural image classification with graph neural networks", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2011 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DIGITAL IMAGE COMPUTING TECHNIQUES AND APPLICATIONS (DICTA'11), (20111206), doi:10.1109/DICTA.2011.77, pages 416 - 421, XP032094824 [I] 12-24 * sections II and III *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/DICTA.2011.77