Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3105700

EP3105700 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING USER, AND COMPUTER READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.01.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip30.10.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / GUPTA, Sandeep
2-A, Sector-126
Noida, Uttar Pradesh 201303 / IN
02 / KAKKAR, Gaurav
2-A, Sector-126
Noida, Uttar Pradesh 201303 / IN
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]01 / GUPTA, Sandeep
2-A Sector-126
Noida Uttar Pradesh 201303 / IN
02 / KAKKAR, Gaurav
2-A Sector-126
Noida Uttar Pradesh 201303 / IN
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/51]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15749563.113.02.2015
[2016/51]
WO2015KR01477
Priority number, dateIN2014CHE68914.02.2014         Original published format: IN 689CH2014
KR2015000880619.01.2015         Original published format: KR 20150008806
[2017/16]
Former [2016/51]IN2014CHE068914.02.2014
KR2015000880619.01.2015
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015122716
Date:20.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3105700
Date:21.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2015
[2016/51]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR20.08.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/36
[2016/51]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/51]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR BENUTZERAUTHENTIFIZIERUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM[2016/51]
English:ELECTRONIC DEVICE, METHOD FOR AUTHENTICATING USER, AND COMPUTER READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM[2016/51]
French:DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE, PROCÉDÉ POUR AUTHENTIFIER UN UTILISATEUR ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR[2016/51]
Entry into regional phase25.04.2016National basic fee paid 
25.04.2016Search fee paid 
25.04.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2016Examination requested  [2016/51]
25.04.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.01.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.05.2019Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
19.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[I]EP2528010  (APPLE INC [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0026] , [0039] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0125] * * figures 13-15 *
International search[XY]US2010180336  (NOLAN JONES et al.) [X] 1-9, 11-15 * See paragraphs [0006], [0022]-[0024], [0028]-[0031], [0037]; and figures 3, 5-7. * [Y] 10;
 [Y]US2009199295  (YUNG-HO SHIH et al.) [Y] 10 * See paragraphs [0020]-[0021]; and figured 1-2. *;
 [A]US2007277224  (STEVEN L. OSBORN et al.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0055]-[0056], [0059]-[0061], [0063]-[0065]; and figures 2, 5. *;
 [A]KR20140001344  (EWHA UNIVERSITY-INDUSTRY COLLABORATION FOUNDATION) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0007], [0034]-[0043], [0064]-[0065]; and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]KR20090065766  (NHN CORP.) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0031-[0044], [0046]-[0054]; and figures 2a-2b, 3. *