Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3185815

EP3185815 - SURGICAL IMPLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  08.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Johnson & Johnson Medical GmbH
Robert-Koch-Strasse 1
22851 Norderstedt / DE
[2017/27]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHULDT-HEMPE, Barbara
Rosenstrasse 23
24576 Bad Bramstedt / DE
02 / WALTHER, Christoph
Dorfstrasse 35
24568 Kattendorf / DE
03 / DEICHMANN, Thorsten
Morier Strasse 41M
23556 Lübeck / DE
 [2017/28]
Former [2017/27]01 / SCHULDT-HEMPE, Barbara
Rosenstrasse 23
24576 Bad Bramstedt / DE
02 / WALTHER, Christoph
Dorfstrasse 35
24568 Kattendorf / DE
03 / DEICHMANN, Thorsten
Brahmsstrasse 20B
23556 Lübeck / DE
Representative(s)Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2017/27]
Application number, filing date15749721.531.07.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015EP01588
Priority number, dateDE2014101271727.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014012717
[2017/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016029990
Date:03.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3185815
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016
[2017/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, D04B21/10
[2017/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHES IMPLANTAT[2017/27]
English:SURGICAL IMPLANT[2017/27]
French:IMPLANT CHIRURGICAL[2017/27]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2017National basic fee paid 
08.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
08.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]WO03041613  (ETHICON GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 7, line 11 - page 10, line 9; figure 1 *