Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3180817

EP3180817 - CONNECTION TERMINAL FOR A CONTINUOUS ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.05.2019
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  01.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
17.08.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 26
32758 Detmold / DE
[2019/34]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
Weidmüller Interface GmbH & Co. KG
Klingenbergstrasse 16
32758 Detmold / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SPEITH, Markus
Pelizaeusstr. 11
33102 Paderborn / DE
02 / RUTZ, Andreas
In der Heide 4
33619 Bielefeld / DE
03 / KÖSTER, Thomas
Paderborner Str. 34
33189 Schlangen / DE
04 / BASTIAN, Lukas
Paderborner Str. 4
33189 Schlangen / DE
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)Specht, Peter , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date15749798.311.08.2015
[2017/25]
WO2015EP68476
Priority number, dateDE201420103754U13.08.2014         Original published format: DE 202014103754 U
[2017/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016023908
Date:18.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3180817
Date:21.06.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/40
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
TitleGerman:ANSCHLUSSKLEMME FÜR EINEN DURCHGEHENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN LEITER[2017/25]
English:CONNECTION TERMINAL FOR A CONTINUOUS ELECTRICAL CONDUCTOR[2017/25]
French:BORNE DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CONDUCTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE CONTINU[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase01.02.2017National basic fee paid 
01.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
01.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
01.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.01.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.08.2019Fee for grant paid
13.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2013137294  (CARDIN DANIEL [CA], et al) [X] 1,4-9,13 * abstract * [I] 2,3;
 [X]US2012088380  (SMITH LAWRENCE J [US]) [X] 1-7,9-11,13 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2011112104  (ELECTROPAR LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 1 * figures 3,3a *