Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3146755

EP3146755 - SYNTHETIC TRANSACTIONS BETWEEN COMMUNICATION ENDPOINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  13.11.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.10.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.06.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.02.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
22.11.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US
[2017/13]
Inventor(s)01 / LEEB, Gunter
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
02 / MENEZES, Pascal F.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
03 / MORROW, Jon R.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
04 / HANLON, William N.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
05 / ZYBURA, John Hillary
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
06 / HASSAN, Amer A.
c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC
LCA - International Patents (8/1172)
One Microsoft Way
Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US
 [2017/13]
Representative(s)Townsend, Martyn
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[2017/13]
Application number, filing date15750166.916.07.2015
[2017/13]
WO2015US40673
Priority number, dateUS20141433785722.07.2014         Original published format: US201414337857
[2017/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016014323
Date:28.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3146755
Date:29.03.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016
[2017/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3146755
Date:16.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/06
[2017/13]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/13]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYNTHETISCHE TRANSAKTIONEN ZWISCHEN KOMMUNIKATIONSENDPUNKTEN[2017/13]
English:SYNTHETIC TRANSACTIONS BETWEEN COMMUNICATION ENDPOINTS[2017/13]
French:TRANSACTIONS SYNTHÉTIQUES ENTRE DES POINTS D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE COMMUNICATION[2017/13]
Entry into regional phase22.12.2016National basic fee paid 
22.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/13]
22.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.05.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.12.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.06.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.10.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
25.10.2018Fee for grant paid
25.10.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL16.01.2019
AT16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
SM16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL16.01.2019
AT16.01.2019
CZ16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
EE16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RO16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
SK16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT16.01.2019
DK16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT16.01.2019
ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
IT16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
HR16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
LV16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
RS16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
IS16.05.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
BG16.04.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
GR17.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES16.01.2019
FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
PL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
SE16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI16.01.2019
LT16.01.2019
NL16.01.2019
NO16.04.2019
PT16.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL16.01.2019
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1448004  (UBINETICS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [00 6] , [00 9] , [0 10] , [0 11] , [0 12] , [0 13] *;
 [Y]US2007026854  (NATH BADRI [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-13,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0019] , [0026] *;
 [Y]US2009094492  (MUSIC WAYNE D [US], et al) [Y] 4,14 * paragraphs [0021] , [0054] *;
 [A]WO2006099473  (MFORMATION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2008080536  (CHHAYA HARSHAL SHANTANU [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *