Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3177250

EP3177250 - WETNESS INDICATOR WITH PERMANENT COLORANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2018
Database last updated on 20.09.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  25.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.02.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.03.2018  [2018/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Procter & Gamble Company
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US
[2017/24]
Inventor(s)01 / KLOFTA, Thomas James
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
02 / TEE, Johannson Jimmy Jr.
One Procter & Gamble Plaza
Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)Mather, Peter Geoffrey
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Sulzbacher Straße 40-50
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/24]Mather, Peter Geoffrey
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
IP Department
Frankfurter Strasse 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15750579.306.08.2015
[2017/24]
WO2015US44001
Priority number, dateUS201462034355P07.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462034355 P
[2017/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016022795
Date:11.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3177250
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016
[2017/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61F13/42, A61L15/56
[2017/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
TitleGerman:FEUCHTIGKEITSINDIKATOR MIT PERMANENTEM FARBSTOFF[2017/24]
English:WETNESS INDICATOR WITH PERMANENT COLORANT[2017/24]
French:INDICATEUR D'HUMIDITÉ À COLORANT PERMANENT[2017/24]
Entry into regional phase25.01.2017National basic fee paid 
25.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
25.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
25.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.09.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/12]
02.11.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time  [2018/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US2014087181  (KLOFTA THOMAS JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0037] , [0040] , [0043]; claims 1-22 *;
 [X]US2013158493  (DE BRUIN PAULA K [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraphs [0036] , [0038] *;
 [X]US2012035563  (RUMAN MARCILLE FAYE [US], et al) [X] 1,11 * paragraph [0014]; claims 1-36 *
by applicantUS5246433
 US5569234
 US6120487
 US6120489
 US4940464
 US5092861
 US3860003
 US5151092
 US5221274
 US5554145
 US5580411
 US6004306
 US5938648
 US5865823
 US5571096
 US7318820
 US6962578
 US7377914
 US5607760
 US5609587
 US5635191
 US5643588
 US5968025