Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3178282

EP3178282 - SPECIAL SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  16.08.2019
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 18.09.2019  [2019/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/24]
Inventor(s)01 / CHEN, Wanshi
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / LUO, Tao
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / SUKHAVASI, Ravi Teja
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/24]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/24]
Application number, filing date15750895.306.08.2015
[2017/24]
WO2015US44006
Priority number, dateUS201462035286P08.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462035286 P
US20151481917805.08.2015         Original published format: US201514819178
[2017/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016022798
Date:11.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3178282
Date:14.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2016
[2017/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3178282
Date:18.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H04W74/00
[2017/24]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/24]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SPEZIELLE SUBFRAME-KONFIGURATION IN UNLIZENZIERTEN SPEKTRUMSKOMMUNIKATIONEN[2019/15]
English:SPECIAL SUBFRAME CONFIGURATION IN UNLICENSED SPECTRUM[2017/24]
French:CONFIGURATION DE SOUS-TRAME SPÉCIALES DANS LE SPECTRE SANS LICENCE[2019/17]
Former [2017/24]SPEZIELLE HILFSRAHMENKONFIGURATION IN UNLIZENSIERTEM SPEKTRUM
Former [2017/24]CONFIGURATION DE SOUS-TRAME SPÉCIALE DANS UN SPECTRE SANS LICENCE
Entry into regional phase06.01.2017National basic fee paid 
06.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/24]
06.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
27.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.03.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2019Fee for grant paid
02.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US2014185535  (PARK MINYOUNG [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0022] * * pages 1-30 *;
 [A]WO2012019321  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-30 * page 2, line 6 - page 5, line 11 * * claims 1-22 *;
 [A]US2009180435  (SARKAR SANDIP [US]) [A] 1-30 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * claims 1-34 *