Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3178282 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3178282



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 331
30.09.2019 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
22.08.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
02.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.08.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
02.08.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2019 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
02.08.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.03.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
27.03.2019 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.03.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 46
27.03.2019 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 46
27.02.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
27.09.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
27.09.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
27.09.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
26.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
26.06.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.05.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.03.2017 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
13.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
13.03.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
01.03.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 6
06.01.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.01.2017 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.01.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
16.12.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
01.03.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 59
01.03.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 64
11.02.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
11.02.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 51
23.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
23.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
23.10.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2