Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3178282


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.01.2020 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.02.2020 [2020/08]
16.08.2019 (Expected) grant published on  18.09.2019  [2019/38]
12.08.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
06.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
06.08.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
05.08.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
26.03.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
22.03.2019 Change - French title published on  24.04.2019  [2019/17]
08.03.2019 Change - German title published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
08.03.2019 Change - French title published on  10.04.2019  [2019/15]
14.08.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
18.10.2017 Amendment by applicant
13.10.2017 Change: Validation states published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
13.10.2017 Change - extension states published on  15.11.2017  [2017/46]
30.06.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.05.2017 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
12.05.2017 Request for examination filed published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
18.04.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
20.02.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
23.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
06.01.2017 Change - representative
06.01.2017 PCT data prior to European publication
19.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
12.02.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
20.10.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
26.08.2015 PCT data prior to European publication