Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3108618

EP3108618 - TOPOLOGY MANAGEMENT METHOD AND NETWORK SYSTEM PERFORMING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  15.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2016/52]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Sung Hee
502-1804 Maetan Jugon Greenville
165 Ingye-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-709 / KR
02 / GUPTA, Ashish
712-1604 Salgugol Seongji Apt.
1526 Bongyeong-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-736 / KR
03 / KIM, Chang Soon
204-2002 Raemian Nobleclass Apt.
243 Gwongwang-ro
Paldal-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 442-829 / KR
04 / YOON, Su Hyun
944-1014 Byeokjeokgol 9 Danji Lotte Apt.
20 Deogyeong-daero 1555beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-811 / KR
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date15751353.223.02.2015
[2016/52]
WO2015KR01725
Priority number, dateKR2014002101123.02.2014         Original published format: KR 20140021011
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015126211
Date:27.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3108618
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015
[2016/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.08.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04W40/24, H04L12/28, H04L12/721, H04L12/707
[2017/44]
Former International [2016/52]H04L12/28, H04L12/24
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
TitleGerman:TOPOLOGIEVERWALTUNGSVERFAHREN UND NETZWERKSYSTEM DAMIT[2016/52]
English:TOPOLOGY MANAGEMENT METHOD AND NETWORK SYSTEM PERFORMING THE SAME[2016/52]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE TOPOLOGIE ET SYSTÈME DE RÉSEAU L'EXÉCUTANT[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase22.09.2016National basic fee paid 
22.09.2016Search fee paid 
22.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
22.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.09.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
22.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.07.2019Application withdrawn by applicant  [2019/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
22.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2004143842  (JOSHI AVINASH [US]) [X] 1-3,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0030] - [0044] - [0072] - [0073]; figure 3 * [Y] 4-6,13-15;
 [XI]US2007153789  (BARKER CHARLES R JR [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3,10-12 * paragraphs [0042] - [0047] - [0051] , [0059] * [I] 8,9;
 [X]WO2013120431  (HUAWEI DEVICE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,11,12 * paragraph [0030]; claim 1 *;
 [XP]US2014133355  (SHU GUIMING [CN]) [XP] 1-3,11,12 * paragraphs [0051] , [0057]; figure 3; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US2013022084  (VASSEUR JEAN-PHILIPPE [FR] ET AL) [Y] 4-6,13-15 * paragraphs [0044] , [0072] , [0084] , [0095] , [0096] , [0101]; claims 1,3 *
International search[Y]US2009016229  (XINZHOU WU et al.) [Y] 2, 4-6, 12-15 * See paragraphs [0003]-[0004], [0024]-[0028], [0065], [0101]; and figure 2. *;
 [A]US2009175223  (ROBERT J.HALL) [A] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0010]-[0012], [0025]-[0029] ; and figure 3. *
 [XY]  - BEN-JYE CHANG et al., "On the Reliability and Utilization Enhancement for Local Repair in On Demand Ad Hoc Networks", Global Telecommunications Conference, St. Louis, (20050000), vol. 5, pages 2445 - 2449, XP010879410 [X] 1, 3, 7-11 * See page 2445, left column, lines 14-16; page 2447, left column, lines 36-39; page 2447, right column, lines 2-27; page 2448, left column, lines 8-11, 31-34; page 2448, right column, lines 8-19; and figure 2. * [Y] 2, 4-6, 12-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/GLOCOM.2005.1578201
 [A]  - BEN-JYE CHANG et al., "Distributed Wireless Links Repair for Maximizing Reliability and Utilization in Multicast MANET', In: Advanced Information Networking and Applications - Workshops", 22nd International Conference on., Okinawa, (20080328), pages 744 - 749, XP031240901 [A] 1-15 * See page 744, left column, lines 1-19; page 746, right column, lines 1-15; and figure 3. *
 [A]  - JAGPREET SINGH et al., "Enhanced Local Repair AODV (ELRAODV", Advances in Computing, Control, & Telecommunication Technologies, 2009 . ACT '09. International Conference on., Trivandrum, Kerala, (20091229), pages 787 - 791, XP031597613 [A] 1-15 * See page 787, left column, lines 7-10; page 788, right column, lines 2-11; and figure 1. *