Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3107741

EP3107741 - LOW COMPACTION CANTILEVER TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.11.2019
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.11.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SM
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
200 4th Avenue South
Nashville, TN 37201 / US
[2018/38]
Former [2016/52]For all designated states
Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
535 Marriott Drive
Nashville, Tennessee 37214 / US
Inventor(s)01 / BARR, Jason R.
94 Goodhue Drive
Akron, Ohio 44313 / US
02 / GIVENS, Samuel O.
922 Jacoby Road
Copley, Ohio 44321 / US
03 / ASPER, Robert W.
351 Tolbert Street
Wadsworth, Ohio 44281 / US
04 / SNYDER, Dennis W.
12290 Cantburg Avenue
Uniontown, Ohio 44685 / US
 [2016/52]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2016/52]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15752372.104.02.2015
[2016/52]
WO2015US14361
Priority number, dateUS201461940950P18.02.2014         Original published format: US 201461940950 P
[2016/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015126622
Date:27.08.2015
Language:EN
[2015/34]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3107741
Date:28.12.2016
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.08.2015
[2016/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3107741
Date:02.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR27.08.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:B60C3/00, B60C9/02, B60C9/18, B60C3/04, B60C11/03, B60C13/00
[2017/47]
Former International [2016/52]B60C3/00, B60C9/02, B60C9/18
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/52]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:FREITRAGENDER REIFEN MIT NIEDRIGER KOMPAKTIERUNG[2016/52]
English:LOW COMPACTION CANTILEVER TIRE[2016/52]
French:PNEU MONTÉ EN PORTE-À-FAUX À FAIBLE TASSEMENT[2016/52]
Entry into regional phase26.07.2016National basic fee paid 
26.07.2016Search fee paid 
26.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
26.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.07.2016Examination requested  [2016/52]
26.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
30.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.11.2018Fee for grant paid
21.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)03.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
07.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL02.01.2019
AT02.01.2019
CZ02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
EE02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RO02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
SK02.01.2019
SM02.01.2019
LU04.02.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/49]AL02.01.2019
AT02.01.2019
CZ02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
EE02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RO02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
SK02.01.2019
LU04.02.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT02.01.2019
DK02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
LU04.02.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/47]AT02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
LU04.02.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT02.01.2019
ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
IT02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
MC02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
HR02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
LV02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
RS02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
IS02.05.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
BG02.04.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
GR03.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES02.01.2019
FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
PL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
SE02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI02.01.2019
LT02.01.2019
NL02.01.2019
NO02.04.2019
PT02.05.2019
Former [2019/30]NL02.01.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US6491077  (LOPEZ JOSE MERINO [FR] ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 4-11; figures 1-2; claim - *;
 [A]EP1294582  (BRIDGESTONE FIRESTONE NORTH AM [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure -; claim - *
International search[A]US6834696  (YURJEVICH et al.) [A] 1-24 * See column 3, lines 44-58, column 4, lines 24-26 and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]EP0010533  (OFFICE DE PROMOTION INDUSTRIELLE) [A] 1-24 * See page 1, line 1-page 6, line 16 and figures 1-4. *;
 [A]US5464050  (BONKO, MARK L.) [A] 1-24 * See column 4, line 20-column 7, line 13 and figures 1-7. *;
 [A]US2013319588  (UCHIYAMA, MASATAKA) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0028]-[0049] and figure 1. *;
 [A]EP1017574  (THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0045]-[0062] and figures 1-7. *