Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9809063 | Global Dossier | 07.11.2017 | B2 | US2015231933 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461940950 | 18.02.2014 | US201514613540 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106029400B | Global Dossier | 25.09.2018 | B | CN106029400 | 12.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461940950 | 18.02.2014 | WO2015US14361 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3107741 | Global Dossier | 02.01.2019 | B1 | EP3107741 | 22.11.2017 | A4 | EP3107741 | 28.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461940950 | 18.02.2014 | WO2015US14361 | 04.02.2015 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015126622 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461940950 | 18.02.2014 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR099480 | 27.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201461940950 | 18.02.2014 |