Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182999

EP3182999 - ANTI-LAG3 ANTIBODIES AND ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.11.2018
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip30.09.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp.
126 East Lincoln Avenue
Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / LIANG, Linda
128 Ada Avenue
Apt. 8
Mountain View, California 94043 / US
02 / FAYADAT-DILMAN, Laurence
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
03 / MALEFYT, Rene De Waal
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
04 / RAGHUNATHAN, Gopalan
901 S. California Avenue
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Böhles, Elena
Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited
Hertford Road
Hoddesdon, Herts EN11 9BU / GB
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15753877.817.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015US45481
Priority number, dateUS201462039081P19.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462039081 P
US201562171319P05.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562171319 P
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016028672
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182999
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/395, A61K39/00, A61P37/02, C07K16/28
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Extension statesBA20.03.2017
ME20.03.2017
Validation statesMA20.03.2017
TitleGerman:ANTI-LAG3-ANTIKÖRPER UND ANTIGENBINDENDE FRAGMENTE[2017/26]
English:ANTI-LAG3 ANTIBODIES AND ANTIGEN-BINDING FRAGMENTS[2017/26]
French:ANTICORPS ET FRAGMENTS DE FIXATION À L'ANTIGÈNE ANTI-LAG3[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2017National basic fee paid 
20.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
29.10.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.03.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
03.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2014008218  (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [I] 1-27 * abstract, p. 2 line 18 - p. 6 line 27, examples and claims *;
 [I]WO2010019570  (MEDAREX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * abstract, p. 2 line 17 - p. 8 line 31, examples 1-8 and claims *;
 [IA]US2011070238  (TRIEBEL FREDERIC [FR], et al) [I] 1-20,23-27 * abstract, paragraphs [0005] - [0018], examples 1-6 and claims * [A] 21,22;
 [A]WO2004078928  (PARDOLL DREW M [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *
 [I]  - S.-R. WOO ET AL, "Immune Inhibitory Molecules LAG-3 and PD-1 Synergistically Regulate T-cell Function to Promote Tumoral Immune Escape", CANCER RESEARCH, (20111220), vol. 72, no. 4, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-1620, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 917 - 927, XP055151722 [I] 1-27 * abstract, page 4 second full paragraph, page 5 3rd full paragraph - page 6 line 5, page 7 second full paragraph - page 8 first full paragraph, the paragraph bridging age 8 to page 9 - page 9 third full paragraph, fig. 2 and 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-11-1620
by applicantWO8801649
 US4946778
 US5260203
 WO9404678
 WO9425591
 US6005079
 EP0404097
 WO9311161
 US4816567
 US5545806
 US5569825
 US5625126
 US5633425
 US5661016
 US5770429
 US5789650
 US5814318
 US5874299
 US5877397
 US4683195
 US4399216
 US4912040
 US4740461
 US4959455
 US6331415
 EP0216846
 EP0256055
 EP0323997
 US6946292
 US7214775
 US7795002
 WO2013066765
 US5693762
 US5585089
 US5530101
 US7125689
 WO2005047326
 US7846443
 US5624821
 WO03086310
 WO2005120571
 WO2006057702
 US5677425
 US6165745
 US6277375
 US5869046
 US6121022
 US5648260
 US6194551
 WO9429351
 WO0042072
 US5714350
 US6350861
 US7029872
 US7449308
 EP0154316
 EP0401384
 US7052686
 US7662379
 WO2008076321
 WO2012004367
 US6620135
 US6096002
 US5399163
 US5383851
 US5312335
 US5064413
 US4941880
 US4790824
 US4596556
 US4487603
 US4447233
 US4447224
 US4439196
 US6329511
 US5932448
 US5532210
 US6129914
    - HUARD ET AL., IMMUNOGENETICS, (1994), vol. 39, pages 213 - 217
    - TRIEBEL ET AL., J EXP MED, (1990), vol. 171, pages 1393 - 1405
    - KISIELOW ET AL., EUR J IMMUNOL, (2005), vol. 35, pages 2081 - 2088
    - WORKMAN ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 182, pages 1885 - 1891
    - ANDREAE ET AL., J IMMUNOL, (2002), vol. 168, pages 3874 - 3880
    - BLACKBURN ET AL., NAT IMMUNOL, (2009), vol. 10, pages 29 - 37
    - PLUCKTHUN, THE PHARMACOLOGY OF MONOCLONAL ANTIBODIES, SPRINGER-VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315
    - MUYLDERMANS ET AL., TRENDS BIOCHEM. SCI., (2001), vol. 26, page 230
    - REICHMANN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, page 25
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495
    - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 628
    - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 597
    - PRESTA, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 116, page 731
    - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855
    - HARDING ET AL., ANN. NY ACAD. SCI., (1995), vol. 764, page 536 546
    - GREEN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 11 - 23
    - KABAT, ADV. PROT. CHEM, (1978), vol. 32, pages 1 - 75
    - KABAT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 252, pages 6609 - 6616
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., J MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 878 - 883
    - JOHNSON ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2001), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 205 - 206
    - CHOTHIA; LESK, J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, page 877
    - TRAMONTANO ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, page 175
    - MACALLUM ET AL., J MOL BIOL., (19961011), vol. 262, no. 5, pages 732 - 45
    - MULLIS ET AL., COLD SPRING HARBOR SYMP. QUANT. BIOL., (1987), vol. 51, page 263
    - GIUDICELLI ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2005), vol. 33, pages D256 - D261
    - WATSON ET AL., Molecular Biology of the Gene(4th Ed.), THE BENJAMIN/CUMMINGS PUB. CO., (1987), page 224
    - ALTSCHUL ET AL., FEBS J., (2005), vol. 272, no. 20, pages 5101 - 5109
    - ALTSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410
    - GISH, W. ET AL., NATURE GENE, (1993), vol. 3, pages 266 - 272
    - MADDEN, T.L. ET AL., METH. ENZYMOL, (1996), vol. 266, pages 131 - 141
    - ALTSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1997), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402
    - ZHANG, J. ET AL., GENOME RES., (1997), vol. 7, pages 649 - 656
    - WOOTTON, J.C. ET AL., COMPUT. CHEM, (1993), vol. 17, pages 149 - 163
    - HANCOCK, J.M. ET AL., COMPUT. APPL. BIOSCI, (1994), vol. 10, pages 67 - 70
    - "A model of evolutionary change in proteins", DAYHOFF, M.O. ET AL., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATL. BIOMED. RES. FOUND., (1978), vol. 5, pages 345 - 352
    - "Matrices for detecting distant relationships", SCHWARTZ, R.M. ET AL., Atlas of Protein Sequence and Structure, NATL. BIOMED. RES. FOUND., (1978), vol. 5, pages 353 - 358
    - ALTSCHUL, S.F., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 219, pages 555 - 565
    - STATES, D.J. ET AL., METHODS, (1991), vol. 3, pages 66 - 70
    - HENIKOFF, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919
    - ALTSCHUL, S.F. ET AL., J. MOL. EVOL., (1993), vol. 36, pages 290 - 300
    - KARLIN, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 2264 - 2268
    - KARLIN, S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5873 - 5877
    - DEMBO, A. ET AL., ANN. PROB, (1994), vol. 22, pages 2022 - 2039
    - "Evaluating the statistical significance of multiple distinct local alignments", ALTSCHUL, S.F., Theoretical and Computational Methods in Genome Research, PLENUM, (1997), pages 1 - 14
    - DARLING ET AL., ASSAY AND DRUG DEV. TECH., (2004), vol. 2, no. 6, pages 647 - 657
    - KOHLER ET AL., NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497
    - HERING ET AL., BIOMED. BIOCHIM. ACTA, (1988), vol. 47, pages 211 - 216
    - HAGIWARA ET AL., HUM. ANTIBOD. HYBRIDOMAS, (1993), vol. 4, page 15
    - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72
    - COTE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A, (1983), vol. 80, pages 2026 - 2030
    - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96
    - SHINKAWA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, pages 3466 - 3473
    - NETT ET AL., YEAST, (2011), vol. 28, no. 3, pages 237 - 252
    - HAMILTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 313, no. 5792, pages 1441 - 1443
    - HAMILTON ET AL., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (2007), vol. 18, no. 5, pages 387 - 392
    - ZHA ET AL., METHODS MOL BIOL., (2013), vol. 988, pages 31 - 43
    - SONGSIVILAI ET AL., CLIN. EXP. IMMUNOL, (1990), vol. 79, pages 315 - 321
    - KOSTELNY ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 1547 - 1553
    - HOLLIGER ET AL., PNAS USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448
    - TRAUNECKER ET AL., EMBO J., (1991), vol. 10, pages 3655 - 3659
    - TRAUNECKER ET AL., INT. J. CANCER, (1992), pages 51 - 52
    - SCHUURMAN, J, MOL. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 38, pages 1 - 8
    - ANGAL ET AL., MOL. IMUNOL., (1993), vol. 30, page 105
    - REISSNER; ASWAD, CELL. MOL. LIFE SCI., (2003), vol. 60, page 1281
    - PRESTA, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 116, pages 731 - 734
    - BISCHOFF; KOLBE, J. CHROMATOG., (1994), vol. 662, page 261
    - PRESTA, J. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 116, pages 731 - 734,36
    - SHIELDS ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 6591 - 6604
    - CHOI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 100, pages 5022 - 5027
    - HAMILTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2003), vol. 301, pages 1244 - 1246
    - HAMILTON ET AL., SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 313, pages 1441 - 1443
    - LI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215
    - MARSHALL ET AL., ANNU REV BIOCHEM, (1972), vol. 41, pages 673 - 702
    - GALA; MORRISON, J IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 172, pages 5489 - 94
    - WALLICK ET AL., JEXP MED, (1988), vol. 168, pages 1099 - 109
    - SPIRO, GLYCOBIOLOGY, (2002), vol. 12, pages 43R - 56R
    - PAREKH ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 316, pages 452 - 7
    - MIMURA ET AL., MOL IMMUNOL, (2000), vol. 37, pages 697 - 706
    - KRISHNAMURTHY R; MANNING MC, CURR PHARM BIOTECHNOL, (2002), vol. 3, pages 361 - 71
    - CHEN ET AL., PHARM RES, (2003), vol. 20, pages 1952 - 60
    - GHIRLANDO ET AL., IMMUNOL LETT, (1999), vol. 68, pages 47 - 52
    - MURRAY ET AL., J. CHROMATOGR SCI, (2002), vol. 40, pages 343 - 9
    - ALEXANDER AJ; HUGHES DE, ANAL CHEM, (1995), vol. 67, pages 3626 - 32
    - LEE ET AL., (BIOCONJ. CHEM, (1999), vol. 10, pages 973 - 981
    - WEN ET AL., BIOCONJ. CHEM, (2001), vol. 12, pages 545 - 553
    - HUNTER ET AL., NATURE, (1962), vol. 144, page 945
    - DAVID ET AL., BIOCHEMISTRY, (1974), vol. 13, page 1014
    - PAIN ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1981), vol. 40, page 219
    - NYGREN, J., HISTOCHEM. AND CYTOCHEM., (1982), vol. 30, page 407
    - GORDON ET AL., INTERNATIONAL REV. NEUROBIOL, (2005), vol. 67, pages 385 - 440
    - BAERT ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (2003), vol. 348, pages 601 - 608
    - MILGROM ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (1999), vol. 341, pages 1966 - 1973
    - SLAMON ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED., (2001), vol. 344, pages 783 - 792
    - BENIAMINOVITZ ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (2000), vol. 342, pages 613 - 619
    - GHOSH ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (2003), vol. 348, pages 24 - 32
    - LIPSKY ET AL., NEW ENGL. J. MED, (2000), vol. 343, pages 1594 - 1602
    - WU, Recombinant DNA, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1993), vol. 217
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC, (2001), vol. 1-4
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2000), vol. 1
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Protein Science, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2000), vol. 2
    - AUSUBEL ET AL., Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2001), vol. 3, pages 16.0.5 - 16.22.17
    - SIGMA-ALDRICH, CO., Products for Life Science Research, (2001), pages 45 - 89
    - AMERSHAM PHARMACIA BIOTECH, BioDirectory, (2001), pages 384 - 391
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protcols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC., (2001), vol. 1
    - COLIGAN ET AL., Current Protocols in Immunology, JOHN WILEY, INC., (2001), vol. 4
    - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1988), pages 139 - 243
    - CARPENTER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, page 6205
    - HE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, page 1029
    - TANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1999), vol. 274, pages 27371 - 27378
    - BACA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 10678 - 10684
    - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, pages 877 - 883
    - FOOTE; WINTER, J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 224, pages 487 - 499
    - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 314
    - BARBAS, NATURE MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 1, pages 837 - 839
    - MENDEZ ET AL., NATURE GENETICS, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 156
    - HOOGENBOOM; CHAMES, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (2000), vol. 21, pages 371 - 377
    - DE BRUIN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 397 - 399
    - MALECKI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 213 - 218
    - CONRATH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 7346 - 7350
    - DESMYTER ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, pages 26285 - 26290
    - HUDSON; KORTT, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 177 - 189
    - MACK ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1995), vol. 92, pages 7021 - 7025
    - CARTER, J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 7 - 15
    - VOLKEL ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (2001), vol. 14, pages 815 - 823
    - SEGAL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2001), vol. 248, pages 1 - 6
    - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 81 - 83
    - RASO ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, page 27623
    - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207
    - AZZONI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, page 3493
    - KITA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, page 6901
    - MERCHANT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 74, page 9115
    - PANDEY ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2000), vol. 275, page 38633
    - ZHENG ET AL., J. BIOL CHEM., (2001), vol. 276, page 12999
    - PROPST ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, page 2214
    - LONG, ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 17, page 875
    - MEYAARD ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 283 - 290
    - WRIGHT ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2000), vol. 13, pages 233 - 242
    - KAITHAMANA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 163, pages 5157 - 5164
    - LE DOUSSAL ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 169 - 175
    - GIBELLINI ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, pages 3891 - 3898
    - HSING; BISHOP, J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 2804 - 2811
    - EVERTS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, pages 883 - 889
    - MENNE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS, (2000), vol. 16, pages 741 - 742
    - MENNE ET AL., BIOINFORMATICS APPLICATIONS NOTE, (2000), vol. 16, pages 741 - 742
    - WREN ET AL., COMPUT. METHODS PROGRAMS BIOMED., (2002), vol. 68, pages 177 - 181
    - VON HEIJNE, EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1983), vol. 133, pages 17 - 21
    - VON HEIJNE, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1986), vol. 14, pages 4683 - 4690
    - WORKMAN ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, pages 2255 - 2263
    - RATHANASWAMI ET AL., ANALYLITICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 373, no. 1, pages 52 - 60
    - XIE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2005), vol. 304, no. 1-2, pages 1 - 14
 EP19890303964