Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191791

EP3191791 - METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MEASURING A LOAD ON A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND POWER PLANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.11.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.06.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  10.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip06.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Weidmüller Monitoring Systems GmbH
Else-Sander-Str. 8
01099 Dresden / DE
[2018/17]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20 Wernerstrasse 1
70442 Stuttgart / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BUCHTALA, Boris
Lindachstrasse 38
75417 Muehlacker / DE
02 / HESS, Felix
Richard-Arnold-Strasse 25
71642 Ludwigsburg / DE
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Thürer, Andreas
Bosch Rexroth AG
DC/IPR
Zum Eisengiesser 1
97816 Lohr am Main / DE
Application number, filing date15754238.227.08.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015EP69604
Priority number, dateDE20141021826612.09.2014         Original published format: DE102014218266
[2017/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016037858
Date:17.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191791
Date:19.07.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:F03D17/00, G01M5/00, G01B7/16
[2019/48]
Former International [2017/29]G01B7/16, F03D7/02, G01M5/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND STEUERGERÄT ZUM ERFASSEN EINER LAST AUF EIN ROTORBLATT EINER WINDENERGIEANLAGE[2017/29]
English:METHOD AND CONTROL DEVICE FOR MEASURING A LOAD ON A ROTOR BLADE OF A WIND POWER PLANT[2017/29]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE PERMETTANT DE DÉTECTER UNE CHARGE SUR UNE PALE DE ROTOR D'UNE ÉOLIENNE[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase12.04.2017National basic fee paid 
12.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
12.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
06.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.12.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.04.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2013091638  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [X] 1,9,10 * page 6, paragraph 6 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 2; claims 1,15,20,21 * [Y] 1-10;
 [Y]US2006140761  (LEMIEUX DAVID L [US]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO2013097860  (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2010140936  (BENITO PEDRO L [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *