Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3111354

EP3111354 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING USER SUPPLIED ITEMS ASSERTED ABOUT THE USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.04.2018Amendment by applicant 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zoosk, Inc.
989 Market Street, 5th Floor
San Francisco
94103 California / US
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / MEHR, Alexander
501 Beale Street Unit Ph1d
San Francisco, CA 94105 / US
02 / ZADEH, Shayan
760 Dolores Street
San Francisco, CA 94115 / US
03 / CRANE, Jared
641 Natoma Street
San Francisco, CA 94103 / US
04 / ROYSE, Joshua
2000 Broadway Street Apt. 505
San Francisco, CA 94115 / US
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Liesegang, Eva
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]Liesegang, Eva
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date15754447.927.02.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015US18189
Priority number, dateUS201461946425P28.02.2014         Original published format: US 201461946425 P
[2017/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015131156
Date:03.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3111354
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR03.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06, G06F21/32, G06K9/00
[2017/40]
Former International [2017/01]G06F21/00, G06F21/30
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERIFIZIERUNG VON BENUTZERSEITIG GELTEND GEMACHTEN BEREITGESTELLTEN ELEMENTEN ÜBER DEN BENUTZER[2017/01]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR VERIFYING USER SUPPLIED ITEMS ASSERTED ABOUT THE USER[2017/01]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE VÉRIFICATION D'ÉLÉMENTS FOURNIS PAR L'UTILISATEUR ET VALIDÉS CONCERNANT L'UTILISATEUR[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase28.09.2016National basic fee paid 
28.09.2016Search fee paid 
28.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
28.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2009169062  (CHEUNG WAI YEE [HK], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0017] - [0022] * * paragraphs [0065] - [0076] *;
 [X]US8532343  (FREEDMAN STEVEN JAY [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * column 7, lines 10-56 * * column 21, line 50 - column 22, line 34 * * column 25, line 49 - column 26, line 67 * * column 28, line 4 - column 31, line 19 * * column 32, lines 36-59 *;
 [X]US2012106805  (SHUSTER GARY S [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [00 9] , [0 16] * * paragraphs [0024] - [0037] *
International search[A]KR101285832B  (JEON SEUNG HUN [KR]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0039]-[0059], [0114]-[0118], and [0131]-[0132]; claims 1-7; and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]US2012106805  (SHUSTER GARY S [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0017] and [0021]-[0038]; claims 1-10; and figures 1-2. *;
 [A]US2011167059  (FALLAH FARZAN [US]) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0104]-[0160]; claims 1-9; and figures 1-5. *;
 [A]US2012259725  (WEHMEIER DOUG H [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0057]; claims 1-5; and figures 2-3. *;
 [A]US2012136877  (ZADEH SHAYAN G [US], et al) [A] 1-24 * See paragraphs [0014]-[0090]; claims 1-8; and figures 2-3. *