Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3110565

EP3110565 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATING THE APPLICATION OF FRICTION-MODIFYING COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2018New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DBI Holding LLC
100 North Conahan Drive
Hazleton, PA 18201 / US
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / STONE, Jack D., Jr
4122 High Star Lane
Dallas, Texas 75287 / US
02 / RAINWATER, Jeff
7630 Jordan Lane
Midlothian, TX 76063 / US
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lacon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]Korenberg, Alexander Tal , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP
20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date15755698.625.02.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015US17608
Priority number, dateUS20141418995525.02.2014         Original published format: US201414189955
US20141446054315.08.2014         Original published format: US201414460543
[2017/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015130853
Date:03.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3110565
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.2015
[2017/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:IL03.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:B05D5/02, E01C19/16, E01C19/21, B05B1/20
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUTOMATISIERUNG DER ANWENDUNG VON REIBUNGSMODIFIZIERENDEN BESCHICHTUNGEN[2017/01]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR AUTOMATING THE APPLICATION OF FRICTION-MODIFYING COATINGS[2017/01]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'AUTOMATISATION DE L'APPLICATION DE REVÊTEMENTS MODIFICATEURS DE LA FRICTION[2017/01]
Entry into regional phase23.09.2016National basic fee paid 
23.09.2016Search fee paid 
23.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
23.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
23.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.08.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE20000996U  (VOEGELE AG J [DE]) [X] 1,4,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 9-15 [I] 2,3,8;
 [Y]WO2010030848  (HIGH FRICTION SURFACING LLC [US], et al) [Y] 9-15 * the whole document *
International search[XY]US1971262  (HENDRICKS NATHAN V) [X] 1-11 * Entire document Entire document * [Y] 12-22;
 [X]US1961971  (LIONEL IGNACE) [X] 1-11 * Entire document *;
 [Y]WO2010030848  (HIGH FRICTION SURFACING LLC [US], et al) [Y] 12-22 * Entire document *;
 [A]FR2631992  (ACMAR [FR]) [A] 1-11 * Entire document *;
 [A]DE4403243  (BREINING ROBERT MASCH [DE]) [A] 1-11 * Entire document *