Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3112113

EP3112113 - METHOD FOR TAKING APART TIRES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/01]METHOD FOR SEPARATING TIRE
[2018/03]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  25.05.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.01.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bridgestone Corporation
1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
[2017/01]
Inventor(s)01 / YAMASHITA, Hiromasa
c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION
1-1 Kyobashi 3-chome
Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104-8340 / JP
 [2017/01]
Representative(s)Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/01]Oxley, Robin John George
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date15756017.823.02.2015
[2017/01]
WO2015JP55021
Priority number, dateJP2014003558526.02.2014         Original published format: JP 2014035585
[2017/01]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015129620
Date:03.09.2015
Language:JA
[2015/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3112113
Date:04.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3112113
Date:27.06.2018
Language:EN
[2018/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP03.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.01.2017
ClassificationInternational:B29B17/02, B60C5/01, B60C19/00
[2017/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/01]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REIFENZERLEGUNG[2018/03]
English:METHOD FOR TAKING APART TIRES[2018/03]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN PIÈCES DE PNEUMATIQUES[2018/03]
Former [2017/01]VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON REIFEN
Former [2017/01]METHOD FOR SEPARATING TIRE
Former [2017/01]PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION D'UN PNEUMATIQUE
Entry into regional phase30.08.2016Translation filed 
30.08.2016National basic fee paid 
30.08.2016Search fee paid 
30.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2016Examination requested  [2017/01]
30.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2018Fee for grant paid
15.05.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)28.03.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL27.06.2018
AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
LU23.02.2019
[2019/51]
Former [2019/47]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
LU23.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
MC27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/37]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SI27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/26]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
DK27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/12]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
ES27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/11]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
SM27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/10]AT27.06.2018
CZ27.06.2018
EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
PL27.06.2018
RO27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
SK27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/09]EE27.06.2018
FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/08]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
IS27.10.2018
Former [2019/03]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
NL27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/52]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
GR28.09.2018
Former [2018/51]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
LV27.06.2018
RS27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/50]FI27.06.2018
HR27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/49]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
SE27.06.2018
BG27.09.2018
NO27.09.2018
Former [2018/47]FI27.06.2018
LT27.06.2018
NO27.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[I]FR2798089  (PRIOUL LOIC [FR]) [I] 1-5 * figures 1,2 * * page 6, line 16 - line 24; figures 13,14 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 36; figure 15 *;
 [I]US2011023668  (MCMAHON EDWARD [US] ET AL) [I] 1-3 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036]; figures 2-4 *;
 [I]US2012125505  (INCAVO JOSEPH ALAN [US] ET AL) [I] 1,2,5,6 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0043] *;
 [A]US6477931  (DENNEY DENYS [US]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 64 - column 5, line 10; figure 1 * * column 8, line 14 - line 38; figure 8 *;
 [A]GB499567  (ARIE JOHAN STIKKEL; DIRK JAN VAN WIJNGAARDEN) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 2 - line 56; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]RU2375178  (G OBRAZOVATEL NOE UCHREZHDENIE [RU]) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[YA]JP2013014065  (Bridgestone Corp.) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0010], [0051], [0062] (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5;
 [YA]JP2004136423  (Yoshiaki NITTA) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraph [0024]; fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5;
 [YA]JPH04293605  (Bridgestone Corp.) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraphs [0011] to [0014]; fig. 1 to 4 (Family: none) * [A] 4, 5;
 [YA]JP2003534956  (DOBOZY, John) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraph [0027] & WO 2002/028609 A1 * [A] 4, 5;
 [YA]JP2002528305  (Sanzio Agostinelli) [Y] 1-3, 6 * , claims; paragraph [0034]; fig. 1 & US 2001/0047585 A1 & US 2002/0088557 A1 & WO 2000/026002 A1 & WO 2000/074904 A1 * [A] 4, 5;
 [YA]JPH10202659  (Yoshisuke MIYANO) [Y] 6 * , claims; paragraph [0009] (Family: none) * [A] 1-5;
 [YA]JPS62288016  (Sekisui Plastics Co., Ltd.) [Y] 6 * , claims; page 3, upper right column, line 8 to lower left column, line 8 (Family: none) * [A] 1-5