Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3183794

EP3183794 - FAST BATTERY CHARGING THROUGH DIGITAL FEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.11.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / VON NOVAK III, William Henry
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / IRISH, Linda Stacey
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Dunlop, Hugh Christopher , et al
Maucher Jenkins
26 Caxton Street
London SW1H 0RJ / GB
[2017/26]
Application number, filing date15756278.613.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015US45038
Priority number, dateUS20141446390920.08.2014         Original published format: US201414463909
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016028597
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3183794
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:SCHNELLE BATTERIELADUNG DURCH DIGITALE RÜCKKOPPLUNG[2017/26]
English:FAST BATTERY CHARGING THROUGH DIGITAL FEEDBACK[2017/26]
French:CHARGE RAPIDE DE PILE AU MOYEN D'UNE RÉTROACTION NUMÉRIQUE[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase06.01.2017National basic fee paid 
06.01.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
06.01.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.06.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.01.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
06.01.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.01.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2014117923  (HAWAWINI SHADI [US], et al) [Y] 1-28 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2014070774  (TERLIZZI JEFFREY T [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,10-22,24-28 * paragraphs [0005] , [0029] , [0031]; figures 6,7; claims 2, 5, 8, 10, 11, 12 *;
 [Y]WO2009050625  (NXP BV [NL], et al) [Y] 1,14,15,28 * page 3, lines 5-19; page 11, lines 23-27;; figures 1,3,6 *;
 [Y]US2012153908  (WU HAI-ZHOU [CN]) [Y] 9,23 * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] , [0023]; figures 1,2 *