Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3179991

EP3179991 - THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS OF A BTK INHIBITOR, A PI3K INHIBITOR, A JAK-2 INHIBITOR, AND/OR A BCL-2 INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acerta Pharma B.V.
RK4210
Industrielaan 63
5349 AE Oss / NL
[2017/30]
Former [2017/25]For all designated states
Acerta Pharma B.V.
RK4210 - Tjeerd Barf
Industrielaan 63
5349 AE Oss / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HAMDY, Ahmed
640 Henry Cowell Drive
Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US
02 / ROTHBAUM, Wayne
101 Central Park West
PHC
New York, New York 10023 / US
03 / IZUMI, Raquel
3437 Brittan Avenue
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
04 / LANNUTTI, Brian
627 Glencrest Place
Solana Beach, California 92075 / US
05 / COVEY, Todd
3437 Brittan Avenue
San Carlos, California 94070 / US
06 / ULRICH, Roger
22525 SE 46th Place
Sammamish, Washington 98075 / US
07 / JOHNSON, Dave
321 High School Road NE STE 03
Bainbridge IS, WA 98110-2548 / US
08 / BARF, Tjeerd
St. Luciastraat 7
NL-5371 AS Ravenstein / NL
09 / KAPTEIN, Allard
Marten van Rossemsingel 51
NL-5301 HB Zaltbommel / NL
 [2017/25]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2017/25]
Application number, filing date15757002.911.08.2015
[2017/25]
WO2015IB56126
Priority number, dateUS201462035795P11.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462035795 P
US201462088240P05.12.2014         Original published format: US 201462088240 P
US201562115497P12.02.2015         Original published format: US 201562115497 P
US201562181160P17.06.2015         Original published format: US 201562181160 P
[2017/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016024230
Date:18.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3179991
Date:21.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016
[2017/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/00, A61K31/4155, A61K31/416, A61K31/454, A61K31/519, A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61K31/675, A61K31/437, A61K31/4468
[2017/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/25]
Extension statesBA11.03.2017
ME11.03.2017
Validation statesMA11.03.2017
TitleGerman:THERAPEUTISCHE KOMBINATIONEN EINES BTK-INHIBITORS, EINES PI3K-INHIBITORS, EINES JAK-2 INHIBITORS UND/ODER EINES BCL-2-INHIBITORS[2017/25]
English:THERAPEUTIC COMBINATIONS OF A BTK INHIBITOR, A PI3K INHIBITOR, A JAK-2 INHIBITOR, AND/OR A BCL-2 INHIBITOR[2017/25]
French:COMBINAISONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES D'UN INHIBITEUR DE BTK, D'UN INHIBITEUR DE PI3K, D'UN INHIBITEUR DE JAK-2, ET/OU D'UN INHIBITEUR DE BCL-2[2017/25]
Entry into regional phase11.03.2017National basic fee paid 
11.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/25]
27.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.08.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
27.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO2015061752  (PHARMACYCLICS INC [US]; UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [AP] 1 * claims 1-3 * * page 34, paragraph 113 - page 39, paragraph 130 *;
 [AD]WO2013010868  (MSD OSS BV [NL]; BARF TJEERD A [NL]; JANS CHRISTIAAN GERARDUS JOHANNES) [AD] 1-86 * page 78 - page 93; claim 1 * * page 1, paragraph 3 *;
 [AP]  - GRISAFI DAVIDE ET AL, "Ibrutinib: from bench side to clinical implications", MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, NORTHWOOD, GB, vol. 32, no. 9, doi:10.1007/S12032-015-0669-9, ISSN 1357-0560, (20150730), pages 1 - 10, (20150730), XP035522374 [AP] 1 * page 6; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12032-015-0669-9
 [AP]  - G. K. PHILIPS ET AL, "Therapeutic uses of anti-PD-1 and anti-PD-L1 antibodies", INTERNATIONAL IMMUNOLOGY., GB, (20141016), vol. 27, no. 1, doi:10.1093/intimm/dxu095, ISSN 0953-8178, pages 39 - 46, XP055217958 [AP] 1 * page 5, column 1, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/intimm/dxu095
 [AP]  - IDIT SAGIV-BARFI ET AL, "Therapeutic antitumor immunity by checkpoint blockade is enhanced by ibrutinib, an inhibitor of both BTK and ITK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20150217), vol. 112, no. 9, doi:10.1073/pnas.1500712112, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E966 - E972, XP055217955 [AP] 1 * page e971, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1500712112
 [A]  - E KLYUCHNIKOV ET AL, "Allogeneic hematopoietic cell transplantation for diffuse large B cell lymphoma: who, when and how?", BONE MARROW TRANSPLANTATION, GB, (20130527), vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1038/bmt.2013.72, ISSN 0268-3369, pages 1 - 7, XP055217963 [A] 1 * table 1 * * page 1, column 2, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/bmt.2013.72
 [A]  - SONGDEJ NATTHAPOL ET AL, "GIST Treatment Options after Tyrosine Kinase Inhibitors", CURRENT TREATMENT OPTIONS IN ONCOLOGY MAY 2005, SPRINGER US, BOSTON, vol. 15, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S11864-014-0295-3, ISSN 1527-2729, (20140622), pages 493 - 506, (20140622), XP035381545 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11864-014-0295-3
 [A]  - JENNIFER L. YORI ET AL, "Abstract LB-221: Inhibition of rapamycin-induced feedback activation of AKT with dasatinib induces complete tumor regression in a preclinical model of breast cancer.", CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20130415), vol. 73, no. 8, Suppl. 1, doi:10.1158/1538-7445.AM2013-LB-221, ISSN 0008-5472, pages LB - 221, XP055217951 [A] 1 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1538-7445.AM2013-LB-221
 [A]  - BRIAN J. PARK ET AL, "Dasatinib synergizes with both cytotoxic and signal transduction inhibitors in heterogeneous breast cancer cell lines - Lessons for design of combination targeted therapy", CANCER LETTERS, US, (20120202), vol. 320, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.canlet.2012.01.039, ISSN 0304-3835, pages 104 - 110, XP055217954 [A] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.canlet.2012.01.039
 [A]  - D'CRUZ OJ ET AL, "Novel Bruton's tyrosine kinase inhibitors currently in development", ONCOTARGETS AND THERAPY, GB, (20130306), vol. 6, doi:10.2147/OTT.S33732, ISSN 1178-6930, pages 161 - 176, XP055217561 [A] 1 * table 1 * * page 168, column 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/OTT.S33732
 [A]  - VAN DEN AKKER EMILE ET AL, "The Btk inhibitor LFM-A13 is a potent inhibitor of Jak2 kinase activity", BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200405), vol. 385, no. 5, ISSN 1431-6730, pages 409 - 413, XP008177694 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 412, column 1, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/BC.2004.045
 [AP]  - GIROTTI MARIA ROMINA ET AL, "No longer an untreatable disease: How targeted and immunotherapies have changed the management of melanoma patients", MOLECULAR ONCOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140815), vol. 8, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.MOLONC.2014.07.027, ISSN 1574-7891, pages 1140 - 1158, XP029054008 [AP] 1 * page 1151, column 1, paragraph 3 - column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molonc.2014.07.027
 [AP]  - HANTSCHEL O, "Targeting BCR-ABL and JAK2 in Ph+ ALL", BLOOD 20150226 AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY USA, (20150226), vol. 125, no. 9, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 1362 - 1363, XP008177695 [AP] 1-86 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/DOI:http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2014-12-617548
 [AP]  - QINGJIE LIU ET AL, "Design and synthesis of carbazole carboxamides as promising inhibitors of Bruton's tyrosine kinase (BTK) and Janus kinase 2 (JAK2)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20150806), vol. 25, no. 19, doi:10.1016/j.bmcl.2015.07.102, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 4265 - 4269, XP055218382 [AP] 1-86 * page 4266, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 4268, column 2, paragraph 5 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2015.07.102
 [A]  - STEPHENS DEBORAH M ET AL, "Changing The Treatment Paradigm For Previously Treated Chronic Lymphocytic Leukemia Patients With Del(17p) Karyotype", BLOOD, & 55TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-SOCIETY-OF-HEMATOLOGY; NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA; DECEMBER 07 -10, 2013, (201311), vol. 122, no. 21, page 2872, XP008177696 [A] 1-86 * the whole document *
 [A]  - D. CHIRON ET AL, "Cell-Cycle Reprogramming for PI3K Inhibition Overrides a Relapse-Specific C481S BTK Mutation Revealed by Longitudinal Functional Genomics in Mantle Cell Lymphoma", CANCER DISCOVERY, US, (20140731), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:10.1158/2159-8290.CD-14-0098, ISSN 2159-8274, pages 1022 - 1035, XP055218352 [A] 1-86 * abstract * * page 1031, column 1 - column 2 * * page 1032, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 1033, column 1, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/2159-8290.CD-14-0098
 [X]  - J. SCHWAMB ET AL, "B-cell receptor triggers drug sensitivity of primary CLL cells by controlling glucosylation of ceramides", BLOOD, US, (20121108), vol. 120, no. 19, doi:10.1182/blood-2012-05-431783, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 3978 - 3985, XP055218383 [X] 1-3,6,8,11,13,17,34-36,39,41,43,49,51,52,55,64-70,73,79-83 * abstract * * page 3983, column 1 * * page 3984, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2012-05-431783
 [AP]  - BIN CHEN ET AL, "Rapamycin Enhances the Anti-Cancer Effect of Dasatinib by Suppressing Src/PI3K/mTOR Pathway in NSCLC Cells", PLOS ONE, US, (20150610), vol. 10, no. 6, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0129663, ISSN 1932-6203, page e0129663, XP055218386 [AP] 1 * abstract * * page 5, column 3 - page 6, column 1 * * page 8, column 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0129663
 [X]  - L. A. MATHEWS GRINER ET AL, "High-throughput combinatorial screening identifies drugs that cooperate with ibrutinib to kill activated B-cell-like diffuse large B-cell lymphoma cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, US, (20140127), vol. 111, no. 6, doi:10.1073/pnas.1311846111, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 2349 - 2354, XP055218384 [X] 1-3,6,8,11,13,17,34-36,39,41,43,49,51,52,55,64-70,73,79-83 * abstract * * page 2352, column 1, paragraph 2 - column 2, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1311846111
 [AP]  - ZHANG QING ET AL, "[Effect of PI3K[delta] inhibitor CAL-101 on myeloma cell lines and preliminary study of synergistic effects with other new drugs].", ZHONGHUA XUE YE XUE ZA ZHI = ZHONGHUA XUEYEXUE ZAZHI OCT 2014, (201410), vol. 35, no. 10, ISSN 0253-2727, pages 926 - 930, XP008177739 [AP] 1 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.3760/cma.j.issn.0253-2727.2014.10.012
by applicantUS2012157500
 US8193182
 US8569323
 US2012184568
 US2013344061
 US2013267521
 US8193199
 US8586739
 US7932260
 US8207153
 US2013053362
 US2013029984
 US2013029982
 US2012059000
 WO2013010868
 US2014155385
 WO2013010869
 US2014155406
 US8450335
 US8609679
 US2010029610
 US2012077832
 US2013065879
 US2013072469
 US2013165462
 WO2013081016
 US2014330015
 WO2014173289
 US2015005277
 WO2012158843
 WO2012135944
 WO2012135937
 US2011177011
 US8501751
 US8476284
 US8008309
 US7960396
 US7825118
 US7732454
 US7514444
 US7459554
 US7405295
 US7393848
 US8604043
 US7834022
 US8486902
 US8530485
 US7598257
 US8541425
 US8410265
 US2010298355
 US2008312258
 US2011082159
 US2011086810
 US2013345157
 US2014018374
 US2014005210
 US2011223210
 US2011224157
 US2007135461
 US2010022522
 US2013253193
 US2013253191
 US2013253190
 US2010190981
 US2013338134
 US2008312259
 US2014094477
 US2014094476
 US8722693
 US8158616
 US8420629
 US2009233903
 US2013225556
 US2012077798
 WO2014028756
 US8486941
 US2010197671
 US2014005180
 US2014011803
 US2014073643
 US7825148
 US8628752
 US2006167070
 US2014024030
 US2014051665
 US2014045908
 US2012128665
 US2013109045
 US2014079636
 WO2013170182
 WO2013028505
 WO2013067162
 WO2013173436
 WO2013006864
 WO2012162584
 WO2013170159
 WO2013067165
 WO2013074594
 WO2012162372
 WO2012162293
 WO2012155063
 US8673891
 US8586591
 US2011288065
 US2013131082
 WO2012020787
 WO2012020786
 US8673933
 US8202881
 US2013225551
 US2011059943
 US7897600
 US2010152181
 US2010286139
 US8153630
 US7563787
 US8114870
 US2008200485
 US2007142368
 US2009264422
 US2011318393
 US2009029992
 US8399442
 US7977477
 US2010004232
 US2014010892
 US2011224203
 US2007135477
 US8143255
 US8153632
 US8415338
 US2009258886
 US2012142680
 US2012196855
 US2013172338
 US8349851
 US2010317659
 US2013245014
 US2013296363
 US2008269490
 US8703943
 WO2012030914
 US8088784
 US2008287475
 US2010160325
 US2012071480
 US8324252
 US2008139561
 US2013090358
 US8518964
 US2010048551
 US8546399
 US8586754
 US8563735
 US8557983
 US2010305122
 US2010298321
 US2010152183
 US2010298323
 US2010160322
 US8722657
 US8580794
 US8338466
 US2012129853
 US2012157470
 US2012277210
 US2012108590
 US2011124628
 US2013267514
 US2012190688
 US2013267534
 US2014094471
 US2014113910
 US2014088106
 US2010184766
 US2013184278
    - ENGLEMAN, NAT. REV. CANCER, (2009), vol. 9, pages 550 - 562
    - KURT; RAY-COQUARD, ANTICANCER RES., (2012), vol. 32, pages 2463 - 70
    - D'CRUZ; UCKUN, ONCOTARGETS AND THERAPY, (2013), vol. 6, pages 161 - 176
    - K. GHORESCHI; A. LAURENCE; J. J. O'SHEA; JANUS KINASES, "immune cell signaling", IMMUNOL. REV., (2009), vol. 228, pages 273 - 287
    - "Therapeutic potential of JAK2 inhibitors", S. VERSTOVSEK, Hematology, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY EDUCATION BOOK, (2009), pages 636 - 642
    - STAUFFER, CURR. TOP. MED. CHEM., (2007), vol. 7, pages 961 - 965
    - SWARTZ ET AL., CANCER RES., (2012), vol. 72, page 2473
    - BYRD ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (2013), vol. 369, pages 32 - 42
    - BYRD, N. ENGL. J. MED., (2013), vol. 369, pages 32 - 42
    - HART ET AL., "SB 1518, a novel macrocyclic pyrimidine-based JAK2 inhibitor for the treatment of myeloid and lymphoid malignancies", LEUKEMIA, (2011), vol. 25, pages 1751 - 1759
    - HART ET AL., "Pacritinib (SB1518), a JAK2/FLT3 inhibitor for the treatment of acute myeloid leukemia", BLOOD CANCER J., (2011), vol. 1, no. 11, page E44
    - WILLIAM ET AL., "Discovery of the macrocycle 11-(2-pyrrolidin-1-yl-ethoxy)-14,19-dioxa-5,7,26-triaza-tetracyclo[19.3.1.1(2,6).l(8,12)]heptacosa-l(25),2(26),3,5,8,10,12(27),16,21,23-decaene (SB1518", J. MED. CHEM., (2011), vol. 54, pages 4638 - 4658
    - POULSEN ET AL., "Structure-based design of oxygen-linked macrocyclic kinase inhibitors: discovery of SB 1518 and SB1578, potent inhibitors of Janus kinase 2 (JAK2) and Fms-like tyrosine kinase-3 (FLT3", J. COMPUT. AIDED MOL. DES., (2012), vol. 26, pages 437 - 450
    - MADAN ET AL., "SB1578, a novel inhibitor of JAK2, FLT3, and c-Fms for the treatment of rheumatoid arthritis", J IMMUNOL., (2012), vol. 189, pages 4123 - 4134
    - WILLIAM ET AL., "Discovery of the macrocycle (9E)-15-(2-(pyrrolidin-1-yl)ethoxy)-7,12,25-trioxa-19,21,24-triaza-tetracyclo[18.3.1.1(2,5).1(14,18)]hexacosa-1(24),2,4,9,14(26),15,17,20,22-nonaene (SB1578", J. MED. CHEM., (2012), vol. 55, pages 2623 - 2640
    - MOORE ET AL., ACC. CHEM. RES., (2007), vol. 40, pages 1412 - 1419
    - DAUSSMANN ET AL., ENGINEERING IN LIFE SCIENCES, (2006), vol. 6, pages 125 - 129
    - SCHLUMMER ET AL., SPECIALTY CHEMICALS MAGAZINE, (2008), vol. 28, pages 48 - 49
    - OSSWALD ET AL., CHIMICA OGGI, (2007), vol. 25, pages 16 - 18
    - KAMBOURAKIS ET AL., PHARMACHEM, (2006), vol. 5, no. 9, pages 2 - 5
    - CORY ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1996), vol. 37, page 5675
    - CHO, CHEM. SOC. REV., (2009), vol. 38, page 443
    - MALACEA ET AL., COORDINATION CHEMISTRY REVIEWS, (2010), vol. 254, pages 729 - 752
    - J. LIM ET AL., "Discovery of 1-amino- 5H-pyrido[4,3-b]indol-4-carboxamide inhibitors of Janus kinase-2 (JAK2) for the treatment of myeloproliferative disorders", J. MED. CHEM., (2011), vol. 54, pages 7334 - 7349
    - SOUERS, NAT MED., (2013), vol. 19, pages 202 - 208