Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3185705

EP3185705 - METHOD FOR APPLYING HEAT CONDUCTING PATCHES TO A MATERIAL WEB [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.09.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  19.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchatel / CH
[2019/43]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
Philip Morris Products S.A.
Quai Jeanrenaud 3
2000 Neuchatel / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GINDRAT, Pierre-Yves
Route des Croix 9
1907 Saxon / CH
 [2019/43]
Former [2017/27]01 / GINDRAT, Pierre-Yves
Route des Croix 9
CH-1907 Saxon / CH
Representative(s)Lupini, Stephen Antony
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/43]
Former [2017/27]Palmer, Benjamin Jeffrey
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
Application number, filing date15757213.226.08.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015EP69568
Priority number, dateEP2014018254027.08.2014         Original published format: EP 14182540
[2017/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016030433
Date:03.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3185705
Date:05.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016
[2017/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3185705
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00
[2017/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG WÄRMELEITENDER PFLASTER AUF EINE MATERIALBAHN[2019/23]
English:METHOD FOR APPLYING HEAT CONDUCTING PATCHES TO A MATERIAL WEB[2017/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION DE TIMBRES CONDUCTEURS DE CHALEUR SUR UNE BANDE DE MATIÈRE[2019/23]
Former [2017/27]VERFAHREN ZUR ANBRINGUNG VON WÄRMELEITENDEN PFLASTERN AUF EINER MATERIALBAHN
Former [2017/27]PROCÉDÉ D'APPLICATION DE PIÈCES THERMOCONDUCTRICES SUR UNE BANDE DE MATÉRIAU
Entry into regional phase19.12.2016National basic fee paid 
19.12.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/27]
19.12.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.07.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.05.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2019Fee for grant paid
11.09.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.09.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
28.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AD]WO2009022232  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007215168  (BANERJEE CHANDRA K [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *