Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3183459

EP3183459 - AXIAL FAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 19.06.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  02.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ebm-papst Mulfingen GmbH & Co. KG
Bachmühle 2
74673 Mulfingen / DE
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / GEBERT, Daniel
Am Rain 2
74613 Öhringen / DE
02 / PISSARCZYK, Thorsten
Dreschhallenweg 1
75050 Gemmingen / DE
03 / KLOSTERMANN, Angelika
Geranienweg 11
74653 Gaisbach / DE
04 / BOHL, Katrin
Nagelsberger Weg 59
74653 Künzelsau / DE
05 / ENGERT, Markus
Meisenweg 11
97922 Lauda-Königshofen / DE
06 / HAAF, Oliver
Georg-Adam-Reinhart-Str. 12
74635 Kupferzell / DE
07 / SCHNEIDER, Marc
Jagstblick 9
74677 Dörzbach / DE
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Staeger & Sperling Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstraße 19
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/26]Peter, Julian
Staeger & Sperling
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Sonnenstrasse 19
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date15757450.013.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015EP68646
Priority number, dateDE20141011176718.08.2014         Original published format: DE102014111767
[2017/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016026762
Date:25.02.2016
Language:DE
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3183459
Date:28.06.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:F04D19/00, F04D29/52, F04D29/66, F04D29/32, F04D25/06
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:AXIALVENTILATOR[2017/26]
English:AXIAL FAN[2017/26]
French:VENTILATEUR AXIAL[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase28.10.2016National basic fee paid 
28.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/26]
28.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
29.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[I]WO2008143603  (CARRIER CORP [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0025] - [0026] * * figure 2a * * figure 5 *;
 [I]FR2728028  (SARDOU MAX [FR]) [I] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 2, lines 77-89 * * page 3, lines 122-130 *;
 [I]DE69024820T  (SCOATES WILLIAM D [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 6a, 6b * * page 5, lines 2-21 *;
 [A]DE69105703T  (CARRIER CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-3 * * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 34 *;
 [A]WO2012084725  (EBM PAPST MULFINGEN GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1 * * page 13, lines 5-15 * * page 14, line 30 *