Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3116178

EP3116178 - PACKET PROCESSING DEVICE, PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  04.01.2019
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 06.02.2019  [2019/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / YOKOTA, Tomohisa
c/o NEC CORPORATION
7-1 Shiba 5-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
 [2017/02]
Representative(s)Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[2019/06]
Former [2017/02]Reeve, Nicholas Edward
Reddie & Grose LLP
16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date15757950.903.03.2015
[2017/02]
WO2015JP56143
Priority number, dateJP2014004162404.03.2014         Original published format: JP 2014041624
[2017/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015133448
Date:11.09.2015
Language:JA
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3116178
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3116178
Date:06.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/741, H04L12/717, H04L12/64, H04L12/851, H04L12/813, H04L12/879
[2017/43]
Former International [2017/02]H04L12/741, H04L12/717
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:PAKETVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, PAKETVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM[2017/02]
English:PACKET PROCESSING DEVICE, PACKET PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM[2017/02]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE PAQUETS, ET PROGRAMME[2017/02]
Entry into regional phase09.09.2016Translation filed 
09.09.2016National basic fee paid 
09.09.2016Search fee paid 
09.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
09.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
09.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
12.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2018Fee for grant paid
19.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
19.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[A]  - ARTHUR AZEVEDO DE AMORIM ET AL, "A verified information-flow architecture", PLDI09 : PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2009 ACM SIGPLAN CONFERENCE ON PROGRAMMING LANGUAGE DESIGN AND IMPLEMENTATION ; JUNE 15 - 20, 2009, DUBLIN, IRELAND; [SIGPLAN NOTICES : A MONTHLY PUBLICATION OF THE SPECIAL INTEREST GROUP ON PROGRAMMING LANGUAGES OF THE AS, (20140108), vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1145/2578855.2535839, ISBN 978-1-60558-392-1, pages 165 - 178, XP058037335 [A] 1-10 * page 352, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2578855.2535839
 [A]  - MINLAN YU ET AL, "Scalable flow-based networking with DIFANE", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ACM SIGCOMM 2010 CONFERENCE ON APPLICATIONS, TECHNOLOGIES, ARCHITECTURES, AND PROTOCOLS FOR COMPUTER COMMUNICATIONS, NEW DELHI, INDIA, AUGUST 30 -SEPTEMBER 3, 2010, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20100830), doi:10.1145/1851182.1851224, ISBN 978-1-4503-0201-2, pages 351 - 362, XP058189957 [A] 1-10 * page 352, column l, line 7 - line 11; figures 3,4,6 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1851182.1851224
 [A]  - ANDREAS VOELLMY ET AL, "Maple", SIGCOMM, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20130827), doi:10.1145/2486001.2486030, ISBN 978-1-4503-2056-6, pages 87 - 98, XP058030647 [A] 1-10 * page 91, column l * * page 93, column l *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2486001.2486030
International search[A]WO2012105677  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * , claims (Family: none) *;
 [A]JPH11163940  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC) [A] 1-10 * , claims & US 6141749 A & EP 909072 A2 *;
 [A]JP2000089957  (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [A] 1-10 * , claims (Family: none) *