Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3114785

EP3114785 - METHOD OF RECEIVING CONTROL INFORMATION FOR RECEIVING DISCOVERY REFERENCE SIGNAL AND APPARATUS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.12.2019New entry: Date of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
128, Yeoui-daero
Yeongdeungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / YI, Yunjung
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
02 / KIM, Bonghoe
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
03 / KIM, Kijun
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
04 / AHN, Joonkui
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
05 / PARK, Jonghyun
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
06 / HWANG, Daesung
LG Electronics Inc.
Seocho R&D Campus
19 Yangjae-daero 11gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-893 / KR
 [2017/02]
Representative(s)Frenkel, Matthias Alexander
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
[2017/02]
Application number, filing date15758113.304.03.2015
[2017/02]
WO2015KR02102
Priority number, dateUS201461947444P04.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461947444 P
US201461953947P17.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461953947 P
US201461972386P30.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461972386 P
US201461974990P03.04.2014         Original published format: US 201461974990 P
US201461990657P08.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461990657 P
US201462004205P29.05.2014         Original published format: US 201462004205 P
US201462037127P14.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462037127 P
[2017/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015133825
Date:11.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3114785
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR11.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04J11/00, H04L5/00, H04W4/06
[2017/48]
Former International [2017/02]H04J11/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANGEN VON STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN ZUM EMPFANGEN EINES ENTDECKUNGSREFERENZSIGNALS UND VORRICHTUNG DAFÜR[2017/02]
English:METHOD OF RECEIVING CONTROL INFORMATION FOR RECEIVING DISCOVERY REFERENCE SIGNAL AND APPARATUS THEREOF[2017/02]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉCEPTION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE POUR RECEVOIR UN SIGNAL DE RÉFÉRENCE DE DÉCOUVERTE ET APPAREIL ASSOCIÉ[2017/02]
Entry into regional phase27.09.2016National basic fee paid 
27.09.2016Search fee paid 
27.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
27.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
27.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.09.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.01.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.05.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
23.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
26.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[E]EP3151622  (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1,3-9,13-15 * paragraph [0913] - paragraph [0916] * * paragraph [0752] *;
 [A]US2014038598  (REN FANG-CHING [TW], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0037]; figures 2,3 *
International search[Y]WO2014008665  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * See page 1, line 30 - page 3, line 24, page 15, lines 13-14; and figures 4-7. *;
 [Y]  - HUAWEI et al., "Enhancements of RRM measurements for small cell on/off", R1-140038, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #76, (20140210), XP050735605 [Y] 1-15 * See pages 2-3; and table 1. *
 [Y]  - LG ELECTRONICS, "Other Design Aspects for TDD eIMTA", R1-140300, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #76, (20140210), XP050735850 [Y] 2 * See page 2. *
 [Y]  - FUJITSU, "Discussion on discovery and measurement for small cell on/off", R1-140191, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #76, (20140210), XP050735751 [Y] 4, 14 * See pages 3, 5. *
 [Y]  - BROADCOM CORPORATION, "Small cell discovery and measurements", R1-140610, 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #76, (20140210), XP050736135 [Y] 12, 13 * See page 3. *