Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3115223

EP3115223 - SECURITY MARK, AUTHENTICATIONG METHOD THEREFOR, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AS WELL AS SECURITY MARK INK AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  22.08.2018
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip07.12.2018New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
07.12.2018New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Science and Technology Agency
4-1-8, Honcho
Kawaguchi-shi, Saitama 332-0012 / JP
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / ABE, Jiro
c/o Department of Chemistry and Biological Science
College of Science and Engineering
Aoyama Gakuin University
506 Building J, 5-10-1 Fuchinobe, Chuo-ku
Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 252-5258 / JP
02 / KOBAYASHI, Yoichi
c/o Department of Chemistry and Biological Science
College of Science and Engineering
Aoyama Gakuin University
507 Building J, 5-10-1 Fuchinobe, Chuo-ku
Sagamihara-shi Kanagawa 252-5258 / JP
 [2017/02]
Representative(s)Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte OG
Patentanwälte
Wipplingerstraße 30
1010 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [2017/02]Schwarz & Partner
Patentanwälte Wipplingerstraße 30
1010 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date15758242.028.01.2015
[2017/02]
WO2015JP00371
Priority number, dateJP2014004037803.03.2014         Original published format: JP 2014040378
[2017/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015133056
Date:11.09.2015
Language:JA
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3115223
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:B42D25/378, C09D11/50, C09K9/02, C09K9/00, G01N21/33, G01N21/64, B42D25/382, B42D25/387, G07D7/1205
[2017/46]
Former International [2017/02]B42D25/378, C09D11/50, C09K9/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSMARKIERUNG, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR, AUTHENTIFIZIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN SOWIE SICHERHEITSMARKIERUNGSTINTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2017/02]
English:SECURITY MARK, AUTHENTICATIONG METHOD THEREFOR, AUTHENTICATION DEVICE AND MANUFACTURING METHOD AS WELL AS SECURITY MARK INK AND MANUFACTURING METHOD THEREFOR[2017/02]
French:MARQUE DE SÉCURITÉ, MÉTHODE D'AUTHENTIFICATION POUR CELLE-CI, DISPOSITIF D'AUTHENTIFICATION ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION AINSI QU'ENCRE DE MARQUE DE SÉCURITÉ ET MÉTHODE DE FABRICATION POUR CELLE-CI[2017/02]
Entry into regional phase12.09.2016Translation filed 
12.09.2016National basic fee paid 
12.09.2016Search fee paid 
12.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
12.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
02.03.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2018Fee for grant paid
05.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5289547  (LIGAS JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,11-13 * Abstract; column 10, lines 5-59; claim 9 * [I] 3-5,7,8,10;
 [I]JP2011132265  (AOYAMA GAKUIN, et al) [I] 1-13 * WPI, EPO and PAJ Abstracts;; figures 1-3 *;
 [I]WO0106453  (VERIFICATION TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [I] 1-13 * Abstracts; page 5; figures 1,10,12,17 * * page 6, line 19 - page 7, line 15 * * page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 30 * * page 22, line 6 - page 23, line 15; claims 1-4,12,18,25-27 *
International search[XA]JP2010173292  (NIKON CORP) [X] 10, 12, 14-15 * , paragraphs [0054] to [0069]; fig. 4 (Family: none) * [A] 1-9, 11, 13, 16-17;
 [XA]JP2008505193  (Genencor International, Inc.) [X] 10, 12, 14-15 * , claim 4; paragraphs [0111] to [0112] & US 2008/0292828 A1 & EP 1753448 A & WO 2005/123110 A2 & KR 10-2007-0031930 A * [A] 1-9, 11, 13, 16-17;
 [A]JPH08239611  (IMAJE SA [FR]) [A] 1-17 * , entire text; all drawings & US 5702511 A & EP 728820 A1 & CN 1135507 A *