Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3113722 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3113722



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 150
18.12.2019 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
18.12.2019 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.12.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
25.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.05.2018 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
25.05.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
25.05.2018 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
25.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
24.11.2017 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
07.11.2017 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
07.11.2017 European search opinion Search / examination 4
07.11.2017 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
07.11.2017 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
13.10.2017 Search started Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
24.04.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.04.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.02.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.02.2017 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
14.12.2016 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.2016 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
09.11.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
04.11.2016 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
14.10.2016 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
12.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.10.2016 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
27.09.2016 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
06.09.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
06.09.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
06.09.2016 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
06.09.2016 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
22.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
22.08.2016 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
30.09.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 33
11.09.2015 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
11.09.2015 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 27