Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3113722


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
20.12.2019 First examination report
14.12.2019 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
16.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.05.2018 Amendment by applicant
16.03.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
08.11.2017 Supplementary search report published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
03.11.2017 Change - classification published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
03.11.2017 Change - classification published on  06.12.2017  [2017/49]
12.05.2017 Change: Validation states published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
12.05.2017 Change - extension states published on  14.06.2017  [2017/24]
04.05.2017 Amendment by applicant
14.03.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.02.2017 Change - inventor published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
09.12.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
09.12.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
09.12.2016 Request for examination filed published on  11.01.2017  [2017/02]
18.11.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
07.10.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
14.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
06.09.2016 Change - representative
06.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
02.09.2016 PCT data prior to European publication
19.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
16.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication
12.09.2015 PCT data prior to European publication