Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3113722

EP3113722 - FORMING HYDROGELS AND MATERIALS THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  09.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  18.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip20.12.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Endologix, Inc.
2 Musick
Irvine CA 92618 / US
[2017/02]
Inventor(s)01 / PREWETT, Donovan
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92618 / US
02 / MENDOZA, Paolo
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92618 / US
03 / BANKERT, Charles
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92618 / US
04 / DURALI, Mehdi
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92618 / US
 [2017/12]
Former [2017/02]01 / PREWETT, Donovan
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92168 / US
02 / MENDOZA, Paolo
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92168 / US
03 / BANKERT, Charles
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92168 / US
04 / DURALI, Mehdi
2 Musick
Irvine, California 92168 / US
Representative(s)Clark, Jane Anne , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2017/02]
Application number, filing date15758921.906.03.2015
[2017/02]
WO2015US19251
Priority number, dateUS201461949869P07.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461949869 P
[2017/02]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015134906
Date:11.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3113722
Date:11.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015
[2017/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/07, A61F2/94, A61M29/04
[2017/02]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/02]
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON HYDROGELEN UND MATERIALIEN DAFÜR[2017/02]
English:FORMING HYDROGELS AND MATERIALS THEREFOR[2017/02]
French:FORMATION D'HYDROGELS ET MATÉRIAUX POUR CEUX-CI[2017/02]
Entry into regional phase06.09.2016National basic fee paid 
06.09.2016Search fee paid 
06.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/02]
06.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
25.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.12.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7872068  (KHOSRAVI FARHAD [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,9,10 * column 10, line 23 - line 54 * * column 11; claim 7 * [I] 4,6,8,11-15;
 [A]WO2004099265  (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 45; example 5 *;
 [A]WO9812274  (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKAR [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 29, line 10 - line 20 *
International search[XY]US7872068  (KHOSRAVI FARHAD [US], et al) [X] 1, 5-8, 10, 16, 19-26 * ; abstract; column 2, lines 21-24; column 4, line 17-21; column 7, lines 53-55; column 8, lines 20-47; column 10, lines 23-43; claims 1-2, 5-7, 10 * [Y] 2-4, 9, 11-15, 17-18, 27-34;
 [Y]US5643464  (RHEE WOONZA M [US], et al) [Y] 3-4, 11-12, 17-18, 33-34 * ; abstract; column 4, lines 10-17; column 6, lines 28-31; column 13, lines 26-46 *;
 [Y]US2005079147  (DELAEY BERNARD [BE], et al) [Y] 13-14 * ; paragraphs [0049], [0076] *;
 [Y]US2008241267  (VERRIJK RUDOLF [NL]) [Y] 2, 9, 15, 27, 29, 34 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0023], [0079]-[0080]; claim 32 *;
 [Y]US7057019  (PATHAK CHANDRASHEKHAR P [US]) [Y] 28-34 * ; column 23, lines 6-21 *;
 [Y]US2004105778  (LEE ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 2, 9 * ; paragraphs [0040], [0293]; table 20 *;
 [A]US6703037  (HUBBELL JEFFREY A [CH], et al) [A] 1-34 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US6818018  (SAWHNEY AMARPREET S [US]) [A] 1-34 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US7914541  (SAWHNEY AMARPREET S [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US8591950  (BENNETT STEVEN [US], et al) [A] 1-34 * ; entire document *