blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3185475

EP3185475 - RACK DIAGRAM DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  20.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip23.06.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.07.2023  [2023/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ZTE Corporation
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / FENG, Jiaojiao
ZTE Plaza
Keji Road South
Hi-Tech Industrial Park
Nanshan District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Aipex B.V.
Vestdijk 51
5611 CA Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/26]Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Corso Emilia 8
10152 Torino / IT
Application number, filing date15759016.708.01.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015CN70382
Priority number, dateCN20141041920622.08.2014         Original published format: CN201410419206
[2017/26]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2015131665
Date:11.09.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3185475
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN11.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.2017
ClassificationIPC:H04L12/24
[2017/26]
CPC:
H04L41/0677 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:ANZEIGEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG FÜR GESTELLSCHEMA[2017/26]
English:RACK DIAGRAM DISPLAY METHOD AND APPARATUS[2017/26]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE DE DIAGRAMME DE MONTAGE EN RACK[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase20.02.2017Translation filed 
20.02.2017National basic fee paid 
20.02.2017Search fee paid 
20.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
20.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
20.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.12.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.01.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.04.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.07.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.04.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.08.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.10.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.03.2023Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/30]
22.03.2023Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/30]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 08
05.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]CN102364894  (ZTE CORP) [X] 1,8 * abstract *[I] 2-7,9-13;
 [XI]  - "NetNumen(TM) U31 RANBasic Feature Description", (20110101), NETNUMEN(TM) U31 RANBASIC FEATURE DESCRIPTION,, URL: https://www.scribd.com/document/121955852/NetNumen-U31-RAN, (20170509), XP009194327 [X] 1,4 * Section 3; page 9 - page 32 * [I] 2,3,5-7,9-13
International search[A]CN101800659  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101867490  (ZTE CORP) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101202645  (ZTE CORP [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN102104900  (DATANG MOBILE COMM EQUIP CO) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN101083558  (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-13 * , the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.