Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3193614

EP3193614 - IODOPHOR COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED STABILITY IN THE PRESENCE OF ORGANIC MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.02.2018
Database last updated on 18.06.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip29.05.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
National University of Ireland Galway
University Road
Galway / IE
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / O'FLAHERTY, Vincent
4 Forest Hill
Moycullen
Co. Galway / IE
02 / MCCAY, Paul
42 Greenfields Road
Newcastle
Co. Galway / IE
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Goodfellow, Hugh Robin
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/30]Tomkins & Co
5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date15759685.920.08.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015EP69190
Priority number, dateEP2014018168420.08.2014         Original published format: EP 14181684
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016026946
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3193614
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A01N59/12, A01N59/24, A01N25/22, A01P1/00, A61K33/18, A61K9/00, A61K8/20, A61K8/22, A23C7/00
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:JODOPHORZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT VERBESSERTER STABILITÄT BEI VORHANDENSEIN VON ORGANISCHEM MATERIAL[2017/30]
English:IODOPHOR COMPOSITION WITH IMPROVED STABILITY IN THE PRESENCE OF ORGANIC MATERIAL[2017/30]
French:COMPOSITION À BASE D'IODOPHORE À STABILITÉ AMÉLIORÉE EN PRÉSENCE DE MATIÈRE ORGANIQUE[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2017National basic fee paid 
14.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
14.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.08.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.11.2018Request for further processing filed
20.11.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.11.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2005053398  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7-17,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 23 * * page 7, line 1 - line 3 * * examples 1-3 * * page 8, line 1 - line 15 * [Y] 1-22;
 [XY]WO02054872  (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-17,21 * abstract * * page 3, line 4 - line 10 * * page 6, line 5 - page 7, line 14; example - * [Y] 1-22;
 [XY]WO0001237  (KNOLL AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-17,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - line 32 * * page 5, line 16 - line 22 * * examples 1-2 * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 8 * [Y] 1-22;
 [XY]WO9526137  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1-17,21,22 * page 1, line 14 - line 21 * * page 2, line 7 - line 13 * * page 3, line 15 - line 17 * * page 4, line 8 - line 11 * * example - * * page 7, line 20 - page 8, line 26 * [Y] 1-22;
 [XY]WO9111105  (BOOTS CO PLC [GB]) [X] 1-17,19,21,22 * abstract * * page 1, line 2 - line 31 * * page 2, line 6 - line 13 * * page 9, line 13 - line 22 * * example - * * page 10, line 30 - page 11, line 28; example - * [Y] 1-22;
 [Y]WO2012140272  (NAT UNIV IRELAND [IE], et al) [Y] 20 * abstract * * page 1, line 4 - line 10 * * page 7, line 5 - line 30 * * page 36, line 5 - line 13 * * page 10, line 1 - line 20 * * page 11, line 3 - line 4 * * example - *