EP3167631 - METHOD FOR JOINING A CLUSTER OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES COMMUNICATING VIA A WIRELESS NETWORK, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Traxens Heliopolis III 16 Rue Louis Leprince Ringuet 13013 Marseille / FR | For all designated states Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau 78150 Rocquencourt / FR | [2019/49] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Traxens Les Baronnies Bâtiments C 15 rue Marc Donadille 13013 Marseille / FR | ||
For all designated states Institut National de Recherche en Informatique et en Automatique Domaine de Voluceau 78150 Rocquencourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DARAGON, Pascal 7 route du Puits Hely d'Oissel Lotissement le Pascaret 2 13850 Greasque / FR | 02 /
GUZZO, Natale 17 Boulevard Longchamp 13001 Marseille / FR | 03 /
MITTON, Nathalie 68 rue de la Crête 59650 Villeneuve d'Ascq / FR | 04 /
NANDAGOBAN, Arulnambi 36 rue Liandier 13008 Marseille / FR | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Brun, Philippe Alexandre Georges MED'iNVENT CONSULTING Espace Mistral - Bât.A 297 avenue du Mistral ZI ATHELIA IV 13705 La Ciotat Cedex / FR | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15759836.8 | 29.06.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015FR51776 | Priority number, date | FR20140056660 | 10.07.2014 Original published format: FR 1456660 | [2017/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005675 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167631 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167631 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/38, H04W40/32, H04W84/20, H04L12/24, H04W40/24, H04L29/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04W40/32 (EP,KR,RU,US);
H04W4/38 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04W84/20 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04L41/0803 (KR,US);
H04L41/0893 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W40/246 (EP,KR,RU,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | H04W4/00, H04W40/24, H04W40/32, H04W84/20, H04L29/08, H04L12/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 17.01.2017 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINER ÜBER EIN DRAHTLOSES NETZWERK KOMMUNIZIERENDEN GRUPPE VON ELEKTRONISCHEN VORRICHTUNGEN, ZUGEHÖRIGE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG DES BESAGTEN VERFAHRENS UND SYSTEM | [2017/20] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING A CLUSTER OF ELECTRONIC DEVICES COMMUNICATING VIA A WIRELESS NETWORK, ASSOCIATED ELECTRONIC DEVICE IMPLEMENTING SAID METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2017/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ADHÉSION À UNE GRAPPE DE DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES COMMUNIQUANT VIA UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE METTANT EN OEUVRE LEDIT PROCÉDÉ, ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉS | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 17.01.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 28.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2015 | AL | 18.12.2019 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | ES | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | IT | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MK | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | RS | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | SM | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | IE | 29.06.2020 | LU | 29.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 29.06.2015 | |
AL | 18.12.2019 | ||
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CY | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
MT | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
TR | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.06.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
IT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
AT | 18.12.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
ES | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
SM | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
RS | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Cited in | International search | [IY] - HAIDAR SAFA ET AL, "A cluster-based trust-aware routing protocol for mobile ad hoc networks", WIRELESS NETWORKS ; THE JOURNAL OF MOBILE COMMUNICATION, COMPUTATION AND INFORMATION, KLUWER ACADEMIC PUBLISHERS, DO, (20090520), vol. 16, no. 4, ISSN 1572-8196, pages 969 - 984, XP019832836 [I] 1-9,11,12,14,15,17,18 * page 969 * * pages 972-976; figures 3,4; tables 2-4 * * Algorithmes 1-3 * [Y] 10,13,16 | [A] - TONY DUCROCQ ET AL, "Energy-based clustering for wireless sensor network lifetime optimization", 2013 IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE (WCNC), (20130401), doi:10.1109/WCNC.2013.6554695, ISBN 978-1-46-735937-5, pages 968 - 973, XP055177480 [A] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2013.6554695 | [YD] - WENDI B HEINZELMAN ET AL, "An Application-Specific Protocol Architecture for Wireless Microsensor Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20021001), vol. 1, no. 4, ISSN 1536-1276, XP011080896 [YD] 10,13,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | - W. HEINZELMAN; A. CHANDRAKASAN; H. BALAKRISHNAN, IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (200210), vol. 1, no. 4 |