Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3116397

EP3116397 - SYSTEM FOR MONITORING BODY CHEMISTRY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sano Intelligence, Inc.
925 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / PUSHPALA, Ashwin
925 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
02 / CHAPMAN, Matthew
925 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
03 / SZMODIS, Alan
925 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
04 / GHOSH, Abhijit
925 Harrison Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
 [2017/03]
Representative(s)Higgs, Jonathan , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
Altius House
1 North Fourth Street
Milton Keynes MK9 1DG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Stanners, David Ralph
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP The Podium
1 Eversholt Street
London NW1 2DN / GB
Application number, filing date15762313.313.03.2015
[2017/03]
WO2015US20586
Priority number, dateUS201461952594P13.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461952594 P
US201462012874P16.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462012874 P
US201462025174P16.07.2014         Original published format: US 201462025174 P
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015138989
Date:17.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3116397
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/145, G01N33/50, A61B5/00, A61B17/34
[2017/44]
Former International [2017/03]A61B5/145, G01N33/50
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER KÖRPERCHEMIE[2017/03]
English:SYSTEM FOR MONITORING BODY CHEMISTRY[2017/03]
French:SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE DE CHIMIE DU CORPS[2017/03]
Entry into regional phase30.08.2016National basic fee paid 
30.08.2016Search fee paid 
30.08.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
30.08.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.08.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
30.08.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.04.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.03.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2019Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/01]
28.08.2019Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201905   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2013248364  (KAHN CAROLYN R [US] ET AL) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0017] , [0217] , [0234] , [0238] , [0239] , [0243] , [0246] , [0303] , [0306] , [0307] , [0420] - [0423] - [0432] * * figures 21, 23-25, 27 * [I] 7;
 [XI]EP2327362  (DEXCOM INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0259] , [0388] , [0427] , [0444] , [0459] , [0522] , [0579] , [0611] * * figures 2, 3, 13-15 * [I] 4;
 [X]US2010324392  (YEE PHILLIP [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0076] , [0082] , [0090] , [0118] , [0119] , [0122] , [0137] * * figures 1, 22, 23, 34-36 *;
 [A]US2011089957  (SHEPPARD JR NORMAN F [US]) [A] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0023] , [0034] * * figure 7 *
International search[YA]US2003100821  (HELLER et al.) [Y] 1-6, 8-21 * Fig 2, 8, 18A, 18B, 28B, abstract, para [0077], [0237], [0254], [0258], [0259], [0271] * [A] 7;
 [YA]US2013328578  (SHAH et al.) [Y] 1-6, 8-21 * , Fig 1, 3, 5, 6B, 14B, abstract, para [0003], [0096], [0109], [0115], [0116], [0124], [0168] * [A] 7;
 [Y]US2012209303  (FRANKHOUSER et al.) [Y] 4, 12 * Fig 32, abstract, para [0004], [0208] *;
 [Y]US2010016687  (BRAUKER et al.) [Y] 5, 13, 14 * Fig 25, abstract, para [0006], [0327], [0364] *;
 [Y]US2011009824  (YODFAT et al.) [Y] 10 * Fig 1a, abstract, para [0002], [0026], [0114] *;
 [Y]US2012203078  (SZE et al.) [Y] 11, 12 * abstract, para [0057] *