Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3117626

EP3117626 - INTERACTIVE CONTENT ACQUISITION USING EMBEDDED CODES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.09.2018
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2018  [2018/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verance Corporation
10089 Willow Creek Road
Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
[2017/03]
Inventor(s)01 / WINOGRAD, Joseph M.
10089 Willow Creek Road,
Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
02 / ZHAO, Jian
10089 Willow Creek Road,
Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
03 / PETROVIC, Rade
10089 Willow Creek Road,
Suite 200
San Diego, CA 92131 / US
 [2017/03]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2017/03]Awapatent AB
P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date15762332.312.03.2015
[2017/03]
WO2015US20282
Priority number, dateUS201461952840P13.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461952840 P
US201461953668P14.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461953668 P
[2017/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015138798
Date:17.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3117626
Date:18.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.2015
[2017/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.09.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/8358, H04N21/2389
[2017/03]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
TitleGerman:ERFASSUNG VON INTERAKTIVEM INHALT MITTELS EINGEBETTETER CODES[2017/03]
English:INTERACTIVE CONTENT ACQUISITION USING EMBEDDED CODES[2017/03]
French:ACQUISITION DE CONTENU INTERACTIF À L'AIDE DE CODES INTÉGRÉS[2017/03]
Entry into regional phase12.10.2016National basic fee paid 
12.10.2016Search fee paid 
12.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
12.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.10.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
12.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.04.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/42]
29.05.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2018/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.03.201804   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2014014252  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [I] 1,3,4,7-10,12,13,16,18,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0090] * * paragraph [0363] - paragraph [0382] * * figures 3,29,30 *;
 [I]US2014059116  (OH SEJIN [KR], et al) [I] 1,8-10,16,19,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0463] - paragraph [0479] * * paragraph [0491] - paragraph [0492] * * paragraph [0514] * * figure 22 *;
 [I]WO2008045880  (MEDIACLAW [US], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6,8-11,14-17,20 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0055] * * figure 2 *;
 [I]US6411725  (RHOADS GEOFFREY B [US]) [I] 1,8,20 * abstract * * column 12, line 23 - column 15, line 53 * * figure 8 *
International search[A]WO2013163921  (TENCENT TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0047]-[0049], [0053]-[0054]; claims 9-10; and figures 6, 8. *;
 [A]US2012203734  (SPIVACK NOVA T [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0174]-[0189]; claims 1, 23-24; and figures 9, 10A-10B. *;
 [A]US2008301304  (CHITSAZ BEHROOZ [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0040], [0046]-[0047], [0054]; and figures 4, 8, 12. *;
 [A]US2010023489  (MIYATA MICHITARO [JP], et al) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0074]-[0075]; claims 1-4; and figure 6. *;
 [A]US2009319639  (GAO HONGTAO [CN], et al) [A] 1-28 * See paragraphs [0040]-[0059]; and figures 1-2. *