Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3185724

EP3185724 - ITEM OF FUNCTIONAL FURNITURE HAVING AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/27]ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, AND ITEM OF FUNCTIONAL FURNITURE HAVING AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE
[2019/32]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.07.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.03.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019Change - divisional application(s)published on 29.01.2020 [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DewertOkin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2019/52]
Former [2017/27]For all designated states
Dewertokin GmbH
Weststraße 1
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
Inventor(s)01 / HILLE, Armin
Neuer Brink 10
33659 Bielefeld / DE
 [2017/27]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/27]
Application number, filing date15762948.627.08.2015
[2017/27]
WO2015EP69631
Priority number, dateDE201420104011U27.08.2014         Original published format: DE 202014104011 U
[2017/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016030458
Date:03.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3185724
Date:05.07.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016
[2017/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3185724
Date:25.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/52]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A47C20/04, A47C31/00, A61G7/015
[2017/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/27]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:FUNKTIONSMÖBEL MIT EINEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB[2019/32]
English:ITEM OF FUNCTIONAL FURNITURE HAVING AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE[2019/32]
French:MEUBLE FONCTIONNEL POURVU D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MEUBLE PAR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE[2019/32]
Former [2017/27]ELEKTROMOTORISCHER MÖBELANTRIEB UND FUNKTIONSMÖBEL MIT EINEM ELEKTROMOTORISCHEN MÖBELANTRIEB
Former [2017/27]ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE, AND ITEM OF FUNCTIONAL FURNITURE HAVING AN ELECTROMOTIVE FURNITURE DRIVE
Former [2017/27]ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MEUBLE PAR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE ET MEUBLE FONCTIONNEL POURVU D'UN ENTRAÎNEMENT DE MEUBLE PAR MOTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE
Entry into regional phase28.02.2017National basic fee paid 
28.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/27]
28.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
16.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.03.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.06.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2019Fee for grant paid
18.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19218908.2
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
05.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XYI]JP2014064883  (IIDA KAZUYOSHI) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 6,7 [I] 3,4;
 [Y]US2013174343  (CHACON RYAN EDWARD [US], et al) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0085]; figures 1-21 *;
 [Y]DE9300438U  (DEWERT ANTRIEBS- UND SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 7 * page 4, line 20 - page 8, line 32; figures 1-4 *;
 [XP]US2014310875  (IIDA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0247] - paragraph [0255]; figures 3,23,28 *