Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3198201

EP3198201 - METHOD FOR FASTENING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO A SIDE GRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/31]SIDE GRID FOR FURNITURE OR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND METHOD FOR FASTENING A DRAWER SLIDE TO A SIDE GRID
[2019/34]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.08.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 01.01.2020  [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Paul Hettich GmbH & Co. KG
Vahrenkampstraße 12-16
32278 Kirchlengern / DE
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / REHAGE, Daniel
Wilhelm-Hauffweg 11
09137 Chemnitz / DE
02 / REIDT, Daniel
Hermannstrasse 11A
32052 Herford / DE
03 / FROBIETER, Edgar
Kolpingstrasse 4
49205 Hasbergen / DE
04 / HOMBURG, Kathrin
Auf der Heide 43
32257 Bünde / DE
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/31]
Application number, filing date15763272.007.09.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015EP70381
Priority number, dateDE20141011377823.09.2014         Original published format: DE102014113778
DE20151011075403.07.2015         Original published format: DE102015110754
[2017/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016045951
Date:31.03.2016
Language:DE
[2016/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3198201
Date:02.08.2017
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016
[2017/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3198201
Date:01.01.2020
Language:DE
[2020/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:F24C15/16
[2019/34]
Former International [2017/31]F24C15/16, A47B88/40
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG AN EINEM SEITENGITTER[2019/34]
English:METHOD FOR FASTENING A PULL-OUT GUIDE TO A SIDE GRATE[2019/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UN GUIDAGE À COULISSE SUR UNE GRILLE LATÉRALE[2019/34]
Former [2017/31]SEITENGITTER FÜR EIN MÖBEL ODER EIN HAUSHALTSGERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM BEFESTIGEN EINER AUSZUGSFÜHRUNG AN EINEM SEITENGITTER
Former [2017/31]SIDE GRID FOR FURNITURE OR A HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE, AND METHOD FOR FASTENING A DRAWER SLIDE TO A SIDE GRID
Former [2017/31]GRILLE LATÉRALE POUR MEUBLE ET APPAREIL MÉNAGER ET PROCÉDÉ DE FIXATION D'UNE GLISSIÈRE À UNE GRILLE LATÉRALE
Entry into regional phase04.04.2017National basic fee paid 
04.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
04.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
04.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.07.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.08.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2019Fee for grant paid
18.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.11.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
23.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE20010037U  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 1-9 * * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 23 *;
 [Y]DE202008000887U  (ACCURIDE INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * figures 3a,3b * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] *;
 [A]DE102012011844  (LAAG S R L [IT]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] *;
 [A]DE202009005177U  (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-11 * figures 1-10 *
ExaminationDE202005020458U
 DE202009005177U
 DE202009003047U