Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191986

EP3191986 - MOTOR TASK ANALYSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.08.2019
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[2017/29]
Inventor(s)01 / KONTSCHIEDER, Peter
c/o Microsoft Research Ltd.
Roger Needham Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 OFB / GB
02 / ZIKIC, Darko
c/o Microsoft Research Ltd.
Roger Needham Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 OFB / GB
03 / CRIMINSI, Antonio
c/o Microsoft Research Ltd.
Roger Needham Building
JJ Thomson Avenue
Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB3 OFB / GB
04 / DORN, Jonas
c/o Novartis Pharma AG
Forum 1 Campus
CH-4056 Basel / CH
05 / DAHLKE, Frank Kurt
Novartis Pharma AG
Forum 1 Campus
CH-4056 Basel / CH
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Stierwald, Michael
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2017/29]Hassenbürger, Anneliese
Novartis AG
Lichtstrasse 35
4056 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date15763984.003.09.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015IB56719
Priority number, dateUS201462048132P09.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048132 P
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2016038516
Date:17.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3191986
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.06.2016
ClassificationInternational:G06F19/00
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
TitleGerman:MOTORARBEITSSCHRITTANALYSESYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN[2017/29]
English:MOTOR TASK ANALYSIS SYSTEM AND METHOD[2017/29]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ANALYSE DE TÂCHE MOTRICE[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2017National basic fee paid 
10.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
14.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]WO2014127065  (EMOTIENT [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 6, line 7 - line 8 * * page 7, line 8 - page 8, line 5 * * page 11, line 11 - page 13, line 22 * [I] 3-16;
 [I]US2011263946  (EL KALIOUBY RANA [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0052] * * paragraph [0101] *;
 [I]US2006045185  (KIRYATI NAHUM [IL], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016] *;
 [Y]US2013156297  (SHOTTON JAMIE DANIEL JOSEPH [GB], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0052] *;
 [Y]US2014119608  (LEE KUO CHU [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0043] *;
 [XY]WO0188836  (COMMWELL INC [US], et al) [X] 17,19-38 * page 13, line 16 - page 14, line 5 * * page 18, line 6 - page 21, line 11 * [Y] 18;
 [IY]WO2007020568  (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [I] 17,19-38 * page 8, line 12 - page 12, line 15 * * page 1, line 22 - line 29 * [Y] 18;
 [I]US2004228503  (CUTLER ROSS G [US]) [I] 17-38 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0113] *;
 [I]WO2007029012  (NTNU TECHNOLOGY TRANSFER AS [NO], et al) [I] 17-38 * page 5, line 3 - page 10, line 15 * * page 15, line 3 - page 16, line 23 *
 [I]  - JING LI ET AL, "Classifying Normal and Abnormal Status Based on Video Recordings of Epileptic Patients", THE SCIENTIFIC WORLD JOURNAL, (20140101), vol. 20, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TPAMI.2007.40, ISSN 2356-6140, pages 605 - 6, XP055224190 [I] 1-16 * chapter 2. Methods *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/2014/459636
 [Y]  - POPPE ET AL, "A survey on vision-based human action recognition", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, ELSEVIER, GUILDFORD, GB, vol. 28, no. 6, ISSN 0262-8856, (20100601), pages 976 - 990, (20091211), XP026953142 [Y] 1-16 * chapters 1.3.1 and 1.3.3-1.3.4. * * chapter 2. Image representation * * chapter 3. Action classification *
 [Y]  - ATALLAH L ET AL, "Real-Time Activity Classification Using Ambient and Wearable Sensors", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY IN BIOMEDICINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, US, (20091101), vol. 13, no. 6, doi:10.1109/TITB.2009.2028575, ISSN 1089-7771, pages 1031 - 1039, XP011507094 [Y] 1-16 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TITB.2009.2028575
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Optical flow", (20130226), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Optical_flow&oldid=540641648, (20140519), XP055118792 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Motion detection", Wikipedia, (20140817), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Motion_detection&oldid=621654803, (20151028), XP055224127 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - Anonymous, "Motion field", Wikipedia, (20110802), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Motion_field#Relation_to_optical_flow, (20151102), XP055225081 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
 [A]  - S A Solla ET AL, "Large Margin DAGs for Multiclass Classification", (20000101), pages 547 - 553, URL: http://research.microsoft.com/pubs/68541/dagsvm.pdf, XP055170842 [A] 14 * the whole document *