Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3120503

EP3120503 - DEVICE-TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  16.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip17.11.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 20.12.2017  [2017/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku
Sakai City
Osaka 590-8522 / JP
[2017/04]
Inventor(s)01 / SHENG, Jia
c/o SHARP LABORATORIES OF AMERICA INC.
5750 Northwest Pacific Rim Boulevard
Camas, Washington 98607 / US
02 / YAMADA, Shohei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
1 Takumi-cho, Sakai-ku
Sakai City, Osaka 590-8522 / JP
03 / KOWALSKI, John Michael
c/o SHARP LABORATORIES OF AMERICA INC.
5750 Northwest Pacific Rim Boulevard
Camas, Washington 98607 / US
 [2017/04]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2017/04]
Application number, filing date15764111.917.03.2015
[2017/04]
WO2015US21027
Priority number, dateUS201461955010P18.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461955010 P
US201461987324P01.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461987324 P
US201461990658P08.05.2014         Original published format: US 201461990658 P
US201462013764P18.06.2014         Original published format: US 201462013764 P
[2017/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015142895
Date:24.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3120503
Date:25.01.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015
[2017/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/28
[2017/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/04]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG-ZU-VORRICHTUNG-KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN[2017/04]
English:DEVICE-TO DEVICE COMMUNICATIONS APPARATUS AND METHODS[2017/04]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMUNICATION DE DISPOSITIF À DISPOSITIF[2017/04]
Entry into regional phase06.10.2016National basic fee paid 
06.10.2016Search fee paid 
06.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/04]
06.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.11.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XAI]WO2013083197  (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI]; VAN PHAN VINH [FI]; HORNEMAN KARI VEIK) [X] 1,4 * figure 1B * * page 13, line 8 - line 25 * * page 14, line 13 - line 31 * * page 15, line 1 - line 2 * * page 16, line 13 - line 22 * * page 16, line 29 - line 31 * * page 17, line 1 - line 4 * * page 17, line 11 - line 14 * * page 17, line 27 - line 30 * * page 18, line 1 - line 13 * * page 18, line 26 - line 31 * [A] 3,6 [I] 2,5;
 [XA]US2013322413  (PELLETIER GHYSLAIN [CA] ET AL) [X] 1,4 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0121] * * paragraph [0223] * * paragraph [0226] * [A] 2,3,5,6;
 [A]WO2013018291  (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-6;
 [P]EP2739099  (NEC CORP [JP]) [P] * figure 3 * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0072] *
International search[YA]WO2013083197  (Van Phan et al.) [Y] 1, 4 * , entire document, especially; abstract, Claim 1, 10 * [A] 2, 3, 5, 6;
 [YA]US2013208697  (Hwang et al.) [Y] 1, 4 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0042] * [A] 2, 3, 5, 6;
 [XP]US2014314057  (Van Phan et al.) [XP] 1-6 * , entire document, especially; abstract, para. [0014], [0016], [0054] *;
 [A]US2013051277  (Hakola et al.) [A] 1-6 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2013322276  (Pelletier et al.) [A] 1-6 * , entire document *;
 [A]US2014010172  (Wei et al.) [A] 1-6 * , entire document *