Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3120743

EP3120743 - WINDOW-CLEANING ROBOT PROVIDED WITH CLOSED WIPER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.12.2016
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  09.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.03.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ecovacs Robotics Co., Ltd.
No.108 Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou, Jiangsu 215168 / CN
[2017/04]
Inventor(s)01 / FENG, Linqiang
c/o Ecovacs Robotics Co., Ltd.
No.108, Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou City Jiangsu 215168 / CN
02 / LV, Xiaoming
c/o Ecovacs Robotics Co., Ltd.
No.108, Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou City Jiangsu 215168 / CN
03 / ZHOU, Fei
No.108 Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou Jiangsu 215168 / CN
 [2017/10]
Former [2017/04]01 / FENG, Linqiang
No.108 Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou Jiangsu 215168 / CN
02 / LV, Xiaoming
No.108 Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou Jiangsu 215168 / CN
03 / ZHOU, Fei
No.108 Shihu West Road
Wuzhong District
Suzhou Jiangsu 215168 / CN
Representative(s)Vogel, Andreas , et al
Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142
44799 Bochum / DE
[2017/04]
Application number, filing date15764648.017.03.2015
[2017/04]
WO2015CN74385
Priority number, dateCN2014109871917.03.2014         Original published format: CN201410098719
[2017/04]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015139613
Date:24.09.2015
Language:ZH
[2015/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3120743
Date:25.01.2017
Language:EN
[2017/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN24.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2017
ClassificationInternational:A47L1/02
[2017/04]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/04]
TitleGerman:FENSTERREINIGUNGSROBOTER MIT GESCHLOSSENEM WISCHER[2017/04]
English:WINDOW-CLEANING ROBOT PROVIDED WITH CLOSED WIPER[2017/04]
French:ROBOT LAVE-VITRES POURVU D'UN ESSUIE-GLACE FERMÉ[2017/04]
Entry into regional phase17.10.2016Translation filed 
17.10.2016National basic fee paid 
17.10.2016Search fee paid 
17.10.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
17.10.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure17.10.2016Examination requested  [2017/04]
17.10.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.05.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XAI]EP2462855  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1,2,4,9 * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 8 * * column 2, paragraph 14 * * column 10, paragraph 76 - column 12, paragraph 96 * * figures 1,2,8-11 * [A] 3,5 [I] 6-8;
 [Y]CN103565344  (ECOVACS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1,2,4,6-9 * abstract * * figures 1,3-5 *;
 [Y]WO2008087096  (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,6-9 * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 2, line 5 - line 9 * * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 26 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2003066160  (MELLER MOSHE [IL]) [A] 1-9 * page 1, column l, paragraph 1 * * page 2, column l, line 17 - column r, paragraph 21 * * figures 1,4 *
International search[PX]CN203802383U  (ECOVACS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [PX] 1-9 * , claims 1-9 *;
 [Y]CN103565344  (ECOVACS ELECTRICAL CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * , description, paragraphs [0025]-[0035], and figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]CN2331306Y  (WANG YANGXING [CN]) [Y] 1-9 * , description, page 1, lines 3-30. and figures 1 and 2 *;
 [A]CN2877537Y  (SONG FANG [CN]) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]CN1448103  (JI JIANSHENG [CN]) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *;
 [A]KR20120009927  (KIM YONG WOOK [KR], et al) [A] 1-9 * , the whole document *