Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3131850

EP3131850 - GRAPHENE REINFORCED MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
09.08.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UT-Battelle, LLC
One Bethel Valley Road
4500N
Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37831-6528 / US
[2017/08]
Inventor(s)01 / VLASSIOUK, Ivan V.
40 Valley Forge Drive
Oak Ridge, Tennessee 37830 / US
02 / IVANOV, Ilia N.
2007 Marshy Swamp
Knoxville, Tennessee 37932 / US
03 / DATSKOS, Panagiotis G.
8444 Mecklenburg Court
Knoxville, Tennessee 37923 / US
 [2017/08]
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/08]Lewin, David Nicholas
Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
Application number, filing date15765764.413.03.2015
[2017/08]
WO2015US20366
Priority number, dateUS20141421775918.03.2014         Original published format: US201414217759
[2017/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015142635
Date:24.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/38]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3131850
Date:22.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015
[2017/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.09.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.08.2017
ClassificationInternational:C01B32/23, C01B32/194, C23C16/26, B82B3/00, B32B15/08, B32B18/00, B32B1/00, C04B35/52, C04B35/622
[2017/35]
Former International [2017/08]C01B32/23, C23C16/26, B82B3/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/08]
TitleGerman:GRAPHENVERSTÄRKTE MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[2017/08]
English:GRAPHENE REINFORCED MATERIALS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE[2017/08]
French:MATÉRIAUX RENFORCÉS DE GRAPHÈNE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION[2017/08]
Entry into regional phase28.07.2016National basic fee paid 
28.07.2016Search fee paid 
28.07.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
28.07.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.07.2016Examination requested  [2017/08]
28.07.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.02.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.08.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
08.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2489520  (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR]) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0075]; examples 1, 2; claims 1-28 * [I] 3,10;
 [XA]EP2354272  (UNIV SUNGKYUNKWAN FOUND [KR]) [X] 8 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0077] * * claims 1-27 * * figures 1, 2 * [A] 1-7;
 [XI]  - UTKUR MIRSAIDOV ET AL, "Scrolling graphene into nanofluidic channels", LAB ON A CHIP, (20130502), vol. 13, no. 15, doi:10.1039/c3lc50304f, ISSN 1473-0197, page 2874, XP055392926 [X] 1,5 * page 2874, column r, paragraph 3 - page 2874, column r, paragraph 1; figures 1, 2 * [I] 4,6,7

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c3lc50304f
 [A]  - XU XIE ET AL, "Controlled Fabrication of High-Quality Carbon Nanoscrolls from Monolayer Graphene", NANO LETTERS, (20090605), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:10.1021/nl900677y, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 2565 - 2570, XP055156976 [A] 1-14 * page 2566, column l, paragraph 3 - page 2567, column l, paragraph 2; figures 3, 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl900677y
International search[Y]US2013187097  (HONG BYUNG HEE [KR], et al) [Y] 1-7, 14-20 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0037], [0071], [0103]; example 1; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US8398949  (MEYER HELMUT [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7, 12, 14-20 * ; daim 1 *;
 [Y]US2013174968  (VLASSIOUK IVAN V [US], et al) [Y] 6, 8-13 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0042], [0050]; figure 3; daims 1, 3, 12 *;
 [Y]WO2013043120  (UNIV SINGAPORE [SG], et al) [Y] 2-3, 8-13, 18-19 * ; abstract; paragraphs [0005], [0054], [0062]; figure 2A; daim 1 *;
 [A]US8449959  (AKSAY ILHAN A [US], et al) [A] 14-20 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US8535553  (KONG JING [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *;
 [A]US2012070612  (LEE EUN-KYUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * ; entire document *
 [Y]  - SUN, Z et al., "Growth of Graphene from Solid Carbon Sources.", Nature, (20101100), vol. 468, no. 7323, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 549 - 552, XP055144136 [Y] 3, 9, 16 * ; abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature09579
 [Y]  - YOUNG, K et al., "Strong Dependence of Mechanical Properties on Fiber Diameter for Polymer Nanotube Composite Fibers: Differentiating Defect from Orientation Effects.", ACS nano., (20101000), vol. 4, no. 11, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 6989 - 6997, XP055226718 [Y] 14-20 * , abstract. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nn102059c
 [A]  - LIMA, MD et al., "Biscrolling Nanotube Sheets and Functional Guests into Yams.", Science, (20110100), vol. 331, no. 6013, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 51 - 55, XP055116410 [A] 1-20

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1195912