Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3175246

EP3175246 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A PLURALITY OF CASSETTES OR SLIDES FOR SPECIMENS OF BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.03.2019
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  20.04.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  04.02.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  15.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  27.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diapath S.p.A.
Via Pietro Savoldini, 71
24057 Martinengo (BG) / IT
[2017/23]
Inventor(s)01 / LIMONTA, Enzo
c/o DIAPATH S.p.A.
Via P. Savoldini 71
I-24057 Martinengo (BG) / IT
02 / MANENTI, Giorgio
c/o DIAPATH S.p.A.
Via P. Savoldini 71
I-24057 Martinengo (BG) / IT
03 / RIZZATO, Fabio
c/o DIAPATH S.p.A.
Via P. Savoldini 71
I-24057 Martinengo (BG) / IT
04 / BERGAMINI, Vladimiro
c/o DIAPATH S.p.A.
Via P. Savoldini 71
I-24057 Martinengo (BG) / IT
 [2017/23]
Representative(s)Trupiano, Federica , et al
Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l.
Via Larga, 16
20122 Milano / IT
[2017/23]
Application number, filing date15767266.829.07.2015
[2017/23]
WO2015IB55716
Priority number, dateIT2014MI0141701.08.2014         Original published format: IT MI20141417
[2017/23]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016016814
Date:04.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3175246
Date:07.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.2016
[2017/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3175246
Date:23.05.2018
Language:EN
[2018/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:G01N35/00, C12M1/28, C12M1/26, G02B21/34
[2017/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/23]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR HANDHABUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON KASSETTEN ODER OBJEKTTRÄGERN FÜR PROBEN VON BIOLOGISCHEM MATERIAL[2017/23]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR HANDLING A PLURALITY OF CASSETTES OR SLIDES FOR SPECIMENS OF BIOLOGICAL MATERIAL[2017/23]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ DE MANIPULATION D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE CASSETTES OU DE LAMES POUR DES SPÉCIMENS DE MATÉRIAU BIOLOGIQUE[2017/23]
Entry into regional phase27.02.2017National basic fee paid 
27.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
27.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/23]
27.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.09.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2018Fee for grant paid
09.04.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.04.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)26.02.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE29.07.2018
LU29.07.2018
MT29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
[2020/08]
Former [2019/51]AL23.05.2018
AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE29.07.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/33]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
IE29.07.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/26]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SI23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/24]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/21]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/17]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
LU29.07.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/15]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
MC23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/11]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
SM23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/10]AT23.05.2018
CZ23.05.2018
DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
PL23.05.2018
RO23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
SK23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/09]DK23.05.2018
EE23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2019/08]DK23.05.2018
FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/52]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
NL23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/51]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
LV23.05.2018
RS23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/50]FI23.05.2018
HR23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
BG23.08.2018
NO23.08.2018
Former [2018/47]FI23.05.2018
LT23.05.2018
NO23.08.2018
Cited inInternational search[A]DE102010061611  (LEICA BIOSYSTEMS NUSSLOCH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4-6 *;
 [A]US2003129756  (THORNE EDWARD H [US] ET AL THORNE IV EDWARD H [US] ET AL) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0017]; figure 1 *
by applicantUS8722412