blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3220819 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3220819



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 248
16.08.2019 Notification regarding date of start of examination with possibility to withdraw Search / examination 1
16.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
16.11.2017 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
16.11.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 6
16.11.2017 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
16.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
30.08.2017 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
23.06.2017 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 2
21.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
21.06.2017 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
17.06.2017 Priority search results copy provided by EPO Search / examination 8
07.06.2017 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 10
22.05.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.05.2017 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
31.03.2017 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
14.06.2016 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 43
26.05.2016 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
26.05.2016 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 42
22.12.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 2
22.12.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 1
22.12.2015 Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box (for internal ISA use) International Searching Authority 6
23.09.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments International Searching Authority 1
09.09.2015 Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date PCT receiving Office 5
28.08.2015 (Electronic) Receipt PCT receiving Office 2
28.08.2015 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
28.08.2015 Claims PCT receiving Office 6
28.08.2015 Description PCT receiving Office 27
28.08.2015 Document concerning fees and payments PCT receiving Office 1
28.08.2015 Drawings PCT receiving Office 8
28.08.2015 Electronic request for grant of an International application PCT receiving Office 4
28.08.2015 Priority document (RO-procedure) PCT receiving Office 42