blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3198354

EP3198354 - DEVICE AND METHOD ACHIEVING A BALANCE BETWEEN CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF LIGHT-SENSITIVE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2017/31]DEVICES AND METHODS TO ACHIEVE EQUILIBRIUM BETWEEN CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF LIGHT-SENSITIVE OBJECTS
[2020/16]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.02.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.09.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.05.2020
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.12.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  21.04.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip27.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Artratio, S.L.
Edificio CEEI
Ronda Vall d'Uxó, 125
03206 Elche / ES
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / MUKUND PHATAK, Manoj
Edificio CEEI
Ronda Vall d'Uxó 125
E-03206 Elche / ES
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Rambla Catalunya, 123
08008 Barcelona / ES
[2021/10]
Former [2017/31]ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen
Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor
08002 Barcelona / ES
Application number, filing date15767454.016.09.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015EP71200
Priority number, dateUS201462054457P24.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462054457 P
[2017/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2016046042
Date:31.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3198354
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2017/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3198354
Date:10.03.2021
Language:EN
[2021/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2016
ClassificationIPC:G05D25/02, H05B33/08, H05B47/11, H05B45/22, H05B45/18, H05B47/105, H05B45/12
[2020/40]
CPC:
H05B47/105 (EP); H05B45/12 (EP); H05B45/18 (EP);
H05B47/11 (EP); Y02B20/40 (EP)
Former IPC [2020/16]G05D25/02, H05B33/08, H05B47/11, H05B45/22
Former IPC [2017/31]G05D25/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZIELUNG EINES KOMPROMISSES ZWISCHEN KONSERVIERUNG UND AUSSTELLUNG VON LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN OBJEKTEN[2020/16]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD ACHIEVING A BALANCE BETWEEN CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF LIGHT-SENSITIVE OBJECTS[2020/16]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ RÉALISANT UN COMPROMIS ENTRE LA CONSERVATION ET L'EXPOSITION D'OBJETS SENSIBLES À LA LUMIÈRE[2020/16]
Former [2017/31]VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZIELUNG DES GLEICHGEWICHTS ZWISCHEN KONSERVIERUNG UND AUSSTELLUNG VON LICHTEMPFINDLICHEN OBJEKTEN
Former [2017/31]DEVICES AND METHODS TO ACHIEVE EQUILIBRIUM BETWEEN CONSERVATION AND EXHIBITION OF LIGHT-SENSITIVE OBJECTS
Former [2017/31]DISPOSITIFS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR RÉALISER UN ÉQUILIBRE ENTRE LA CONSERVATION ET LA PRÉSENTATION D'OBJETS SENSIBLES À LA LUMIÈRE
Entry into regional phase24.04.2017National basic fee paid 
24.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
24.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
24.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
14.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2020Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
01.10.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.01.2021Fee for grant paid
29.01.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)13.12.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2022/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.09.2015
AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CY10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
IT10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
MC10.03.2021
MK10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
[2024/22]
Former [2023/30]HU16.09.2015
AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CY10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
IT10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
MC10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2023/29]HU16.09.2015
AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
IT10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
MC10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/25]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
IT10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
MC10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/23]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
IT10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/13]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SI10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/10]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/08]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
DK10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
ES10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2022/07]AL10.03.2021
AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2021/52]AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
PL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2021/51]AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
IS10.07.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2021/50]AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
RO10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SK10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
PT12.07.2021
Former [2021/48]AT10.03.2021
CZ10.03.2021
EE10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/46]AT10.03.2021
FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
SM10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/43]FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
NL10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/38]FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
SE10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/37]FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
LV10.03.2021
RS10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/36]FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
BG10.06.2021
NO10.06.2021
GR11.06.2021
Former [2021/35]FI10.03.2021
HR10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
NO10.06.2021
Former [2021/33]FI10.03.2021
LT10.03.2021
NO10.06.2021
Cited inInternational search[YA]US2007188873  (WARDAS MARK [US]) [Y] 1,3-5,7-9 * paragraphs [0029] , [0039] , [0040] , [0044] , [0046] , [0048] - [0049] - [0055] - [0056] - [0058]; figures 2,4,7; claims 1,3-5,7,8,11-13,15,17 * [A] 2,6,10-19;
 [A]WO2012080656  (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al) [A] 1-19* page 6; figure 1; claims 1,4,7,10 *;
 [YA]WO2013175348  (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [Y] 1,3-5,7-9 * abstract * [A] 2,6,10-19;
 [A]US2014278178  (FEIG JEROME [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0024] , [0029]; figure 1; claims 1,4,5,17 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.