Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3193640

EP3193640 - SUPPLEMENT FOR A BREASTFEEDING WOMAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  14.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
New Chapter, Inc.
90 Technology Drive
Brattleboro, VT 05301 / US
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / FORRELLI, Taryn, Louise
90 Technology Dr.
Brattleboro, Vermont 05301 / US
02 / RIGBY, Graham, Robert Michael
90 Technology Dr.
Brattleboro, Vermont 05301 / US
03 / SCHULICK, Paul
90 Technology Dr.
Brattleboro, Vermont 05301 / US
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)P&G Patent Germany
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Sulzbacher Straße 40
65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE
[N/P]
Former [2017/30]Töpert, Verena Clarita
Procter & Gamble Service GmbH
Patent Department
Frankfurter Str. 145
61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE
Application number, filing date15767668.510.09.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015US49392
Priority number, dateUS20141448758616.09.2014         Original published format: US201414487586
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016044056
Date:24.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3193640
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A23L33/10, A23L33/15, A23L33/155, A23L33/16
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:ERGÄNZUNGSMITTEL FÜR EINE STILLENDE FRAU[2017/30]
English:SUPPLEMENT FOR A BREASTFEEDING WOMAN[2017/30]
French:SUPPLÉMENT POUR UNE FEMME ALLAITANTE[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase14.02.2017National basic fee paid 
14.02.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
14.02.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.02.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
14.02.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.12.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time
26.01.2018Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Request for further processing for:26.01.2018Request for further processing filed
26.01.2018Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
31.01.2018Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]CN103463155  (BEIJING LIQIANQIU TECH DEV CO) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * abstract * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]US2003104078  (BARRETT-REIS BRIDGET [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * paragraphs [0149] - [0176]; example 6; claim 10 * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]KR20080008155  (KI CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * abstract * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]CN103446269  (BEIJING LIQIANQIU TECH DEV CO) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * abstract * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]CN101366797  (BJ GUANWUZHOU BIOL SCI INST [CN]) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * abstract * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]CN101293050  (BJ GUANWUZHOU BIOL SCI INST [CN]) [X] 1,3,7-12,15 * abstract * [I] 2,4-6,13,14;
 [XI]US6039978  (BANGS WILLIAM E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,7-13,15 * column 17, lines 39-50; examples 1-12; claim 5; tables 1,3 * [I] 2,4-6,14;
 [A]EP0183305  (HOLLAND MELKUNIE [NL]) [A] 1-15 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 40; claims 1,4,5,9; table A *