Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3191150

EP3191150 - THERAPY APPARATUS WITH INTEGRATED FLUID CONDUCTORS AND NOISE ATTENUATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  23.04.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.07.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  06.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.09.2019(Expected) grantpublished on 30.10.2019  [2019/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2017/31]
Former [2017/29]For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
12930 IH-10 West
San Antonio, TX 78249-2248 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PRATT, Benjamin Andrew
1 Winifred Road
Poole Dorset BH15 3PU / GB
02 / SEDDON, James Killingworth
5 Nuthatch Close
Ferndown Dorset BH22 9QJ / GB
03 / LOCKE, Christopher, Brian
6 Bosworth Mews
Bournemouth Dorset BH9 3SD / GB
04 / MERCER, David
36 Irving Road
Bournemouth Dorset BH6 5BQ / GB
05 / FRANCIS, Loren
16627 Raven Glenn
San Antonio, TX 78248 / US
 [2017/29]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[2019/44]
Former [2017/29]Cordina, Kevin John
CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro
Olswang LLP
Cannon Place
78 Cannon Street
London EC4N 6AF / GB
Application number, filing date15770707.609.09.2015
[2017/29]
WO2015US49240
Priority number, dateUS201462048638P10.09.2014         Original published format: US 201462048638 P
[2017/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016040520
Date:17.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3191150
Date:19.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2016
[2017/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3191150
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, B29C33/00
[2017/29]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/29]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:THERAPIEVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTEN FLUIDLEITERN UND GERÄUSCHDÄMPFUNG[2017/29]
English:THERAPY APPARATUS WITH INTEGRATED FLUID CONDUCTORS AND NOISE ATTENUATION[2017/29]
French:APPAREIL DE THÉRAPIE À CONDUCTEURS DE FLUIDE INTÉGRÉS ET ATTÉNUATION DE BRUIT[2017/29]
Entry into regional phase29.03.2017National basic fee paid 
29.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
29.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/29]
29.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
20.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.04.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.08.2019Fee for grant paid
02.08.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.08.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP19193338.1
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XI]US6261065  (NAYAK ABINASH [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,22,34 * paragraph [0008]; figures 7-8 * [I] 3-5,23,29-33;
 [XI]WO2014082003  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [X] 1,21,28,34 * paragraph [0115]; figure 16 * [I] 2-6,22,23,29-33;
 [XI]US4161264  (JOHNSON BRYAN E [US], et al) [X] 34 * the whole document * [I] 1-6,21-23,28-33;
 [A]CN1437488  (ZEVEX INC [US]) [A] 1-6,21-23,28-34 * abstract *