Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3195339

EP3195339 - ARC CONTROL FOR CONTACTOR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  23.06.2017
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2017/30]
Inventor(s)01 / PRIEST, Marcus
5030 Pacific Village Drive
Carpinteria, California 93013 / US
 [2017/30]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/30]
Application number, filing date15770755.515.09.2015
[2017/30]
WO2015US50076
Priority number, dateUS20141448770616.09.2014         Original published format: US201414487706
[2017/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016044201
Date:24.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3195339
Date:26.07.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2016
[2017/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01H9/44, H01H50/54, H01H9/30
[2017/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/30]
TitleGerman:LICHTBOGENSTEUERUNG FÜR EINE SCHÜTZANORDNUNG[2017/30]
English:ARC CONTROL FOR CONTACTOR ASSEMBLY[2017/30]
French:COMMANDE D'ARC POUR ENSEMBLE CONTACTEUR[2017/30]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2017National basic fee paid 
10.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/30]
10.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
26.10.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5818003  (MOLDOVAN PETER K [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 2-5 * * column 3, line 54 - line 55 * * column 3, line 4 - line 5 * * column 2, line 29 - line 39 * * column 4, line 35 - line 47 * * column 4, line 42 - line 44 * [Y] 7;
 [XY]US6064024  (MOLDOVAN PETER K [US]) [X] 1-6,8,9 * figures 1-3 * * column 3, line 19 - line 20 * * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 26 * * column 3, line 13 - line 14 * [Y] 7;
 [Y]US2008030289  (KRALIK ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 7 * abstract *;
 [A]US2013063232  (TAKAYA KOUETSU [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-4,6,8 * figures 2,3 *;
 [A]JP2007123058  (NEC TOKIN CORP) [A] 1-4,6,8,9 * abstract *