Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3198682

EP3198682 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH PIVOT BLOCK FOR TERMINATING AN ELECTRICAL WIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  07.11.2019
Database last updated on 16.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.05.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  30.06.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip07.11.2019New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TE Connectivity Corporation
1050 Westlakes Drive
Berwyn, PA 19312 / US
[2017/31]
Inventor(s)01 / DAILY, Christopher George
633 Sweetbriar Drive
Harrisburg, PA 17111 / US
02 / HOWARD, Edward John
1344 State Route 25
Millersburg, Pennsylvania 17061 / US
03 / MOSTOLLER, Matthew Edward
15 Oakglade Drive
Hummelstown, Pennsylvania 17036 / US
 [2017/31]
Representative(s)Johnstone, Douglas Ian , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[2017/31]
Application number, filing date15771488.222.09.2015
[2017/31]
WO2015US51381
Priority number, dateUS20141449384223.09.2014         Original published format: US201414493842
[2017/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016048978
Date:31.03.2016
Language:EN
[2016/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3198682
Date:02.08.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2016
[2017/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.03.2016
ClassificationInternational:H01R4/48, H01R9/24, H01R12/51, H01R13/11
[2017/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/31]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRISCHER VERBINDER MIT SCHWENKBLOCK ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN EINES ELEKTRODRAHT[2017/31]
English:ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR WITH PIVOT BLOCK FOR TERMINATING AN ELECTRICAL WIRE[2017/31]
French:CONNECTEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À BLOC PIVOTANT POUR LE RACCORD D'UN FIL ÉLECTRIQUE[2017/31]
Entry into regional phase18.04.2017National basic fee paid 
18.04.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
18.04.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.04.2017Examination requested  [2017/31]
18.04.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.11.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.11.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
13.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]DE102010009169  (PHOENIX CONTACT GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-8,10 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] , [ 0002] , [ 0004] - [0007] - [ 0010] - [0012] * * paragraphs [0018] , [ 0019] , [ 0022] - [0024] * [Y] 9;
 [Y]US4494813  (DALEY JR EUGENE E [US], et al) [Y] 9 * figure 1 * * column 1, lines 9-14 * * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 3 *;
 [A]US5766045  (SAWAKI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 3,4 * figures 3A, 4, 7, 9B * * column 2, lines 31-34 * * column 4, lines 16-47 *;
 [A]JP2007280639  (HOSIDEN CORP) [A] 7 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH08153549  (MOLEX INC) [A] 8 * figures 1, 3 * * abstract *;
 [A]US5729442  (FRANTZ ROBERT HOUSTON [US]) [A] 9 * figures 3, 4 * * column 3, lines 8-25 *;
 [A]DE3644349  (KRONE AG) [A] 4,10 * figures 1, 2 * * page 4, lines 15-26 *