Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3182920

EP3182920 - DEVICE AND METHODS FOR CROSSING OCCLUSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  26.05.2017
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  04.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.10.2019Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips N.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
For all designated states
Volcano Corporation
2870 Kilgore Road
Rancho Cordova, CA 95670 / US
[2017/26]
Inventor(s)01 / STIGALL, Jeremy
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / UNSER, John
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
03 / DE CICCO, Dino
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
04 / MINAS, Maritess
c/o High Tech Campus
Building 5
NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2017/26]
Representative(s)Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2017/26]Steffen, Thomas
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date15772012.910.08.2015
[2017/26]
WO2015IB56065
Priority number, dateUS201462040158P21.08.2014         Original published format: US 201462040158 P
[2017/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2016027198
Date:25.02.2016
Language:EN
[2016/08]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3182920
Date:28.06.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.2016
[2017/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.02.2016
ClassificationInternational:A61B34/00, A61B17/22
[2017/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR OKKLUSIONSDURCHQUERUNG[2017/26]
English:DEVICE AND METHODS FOR CROSSING OCCLUSIONS[2017/26]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉS POUR TRAVERSER DES OCCLUSIONS[2017/26]
Entry into regional phase21.03.2017National basic fee paid 
21.03.2017Designation fee(s) paid 
21.03.2017Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.03.2017Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.03.2017Date on which the examining division has become responsible
21.03.2017Examination requested  [2017/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO2006086152  (NOVELIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7,17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0051] , [0077] , [0080] - [0087] - [0090] * * abstract * [Y] 3-6,8-16,18-25;
 [D]US8480593  (MAGNIN PAUL A [US], et al);
 [YA]US2007293846  (VON OEPEN RANDOLF [US], et al) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0010] , [0029] - [0031] - [0034] - [0045] * [A] 1,2,5,7,12-18,23,24;
 [YA]WO0245598  (LUMEND INC [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,8-16,18-25 * abstract * * page 1 * * page 9, line 5 - page 10, line 15 * * page 11, line 18 - line 23 * * page 19 - page 21 * * page 34, line 8 - line 13 * * page 38, line 19 - line 22 * * page 48, line 4 - line 7 * * page 49, line 1 - line 15 * * page 82, line 10 - page 83, line 8 * [A] 1-4,7,17;
 [A]WO2009144561  (KARDIA S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1,5,12-18,23,24 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 8 * * page 5, line 4 - line 22 * * page 6, line 22 - line 26 *;
 [A]US2009156983  (BONNETTE MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4-9,11,19-21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0010] - [0014] - [0023] , [0063] - [0079] *;
 [A]US2012283565  (RICHTER JACOB [IL]) [A] 1-4,7,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] - [0014] - [0020] , [0021] , [0024] , [0031] *;
 [A]US2009093791  (HEUSER RICHARD R [US]) [A] 1,7,12-22,25 * paragraphs [0002] - [0008] - [0029] , [0041] , [0048] , [0049] , [0065] * * abstract *;
 [A]US2009198153  (SHRIVER EDGAR L [US]) [A] 1,3,12-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0111] , [0125] *
by applicantUS4794931
 US5000185
 US5313949
 US5243988
 US5353798
 US4951677
 US4841977
 US5373849
 US5176141
 US5240003
 US5375602
 US5373845
 US5453575
 US5368037
 US5183048
 US5167233
 US4917097
 US5135486
 US8187191
 US7074188
 US6200268
 US7914458
 US7846101
 US7226417
 US6049958
 US5846205
 US5921931
 US2013303907
 US8108030
 US8049900
 US7929148
 US7853316
 US7711413
 US2011152771
 US2010220334
 US2009043191
 US2008291463
 US2008180683
 US2012224751
 US2012136259
 US2012013914
 US2009046295
 US2013072957
 US6458099
 US2005159770
 US2006184186
 US6394956
 US8480593
 US2008312672
 US7226433
 US6425882
 US5358478
 US6106476
 US5125137
 US5163445
 US5174295
 US5178159
 US5226421
 US5240437
 US6551250
 US5873835
 US2013030303
 US6210339
 US2014179179
    - AZIZ, "Chronic total occlusions", HEART, (2005), vol. 91, pages III42 - III48
    - SHAH, "Management of coronary chronic total occlusion", CIRCULATION, (2011), vol. 123, pages 1780 - 1784
    - RATHORE ET AL., "Retrograde percutaneous recanalization of chronic total occlusion of the coronary arteries: Procedural outcomes and predictors of success in contemporary practice", CIRC CARDIOVASCULAR INTERV, (2009), vol. 2, pages 124 - 132
    - HARRISON, "Guidewire stiffness: what's in a name?", J ENDOVASC THER, (2011), vol. 18, no. 6, pages 797 - 801
    - CARLINO, "CTO recanalization by intraocclusion injection of contrast: The microchannel technique", CATH AND CARDIO INTERVENTIONS, (2008), vol. 71, no. 1, pages 20 - 16