Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3126958

EP3126958 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING COPIED COMPUTER CODE USING FINGERPRINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.12.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.08.2018
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.01.2017
FormerThe international publication has been made
Status updated on  12.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip24.01.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Terbium Labs, Inc.
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, Maryland 21230 / US
[2019/14]
Former [2017/06]For all designated states
Terbium Labs LLC
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, MD 21230 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ROGERS, Daniel, Jordan
c/o Terbium Labs
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, MD 21230 / US
02 / MOORE, Michael, Alan
c/o Terbium Labs
180 W. Ostend Street
Baltimore, MD 21230 / US
 [2017/06]
Representative(s)Kleine, Hubertus , et al
Loesenbeck - Specht - Dantz
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Am Zwinger 2
33602 Bielefeld / DE
[2017/06]
Application number, filing date15772391.726.03.2015
[2017/06]
WO2015US22650
Priority number, dateUS201461973125P31.03.2014         Original published format: US 201461973125 P
US20141431440725.06.2014         Original published format: US201414314407
US20151462155413.02.2015         Original published format: US201514621554
[2017/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2015153260
Date:08.10.2015
Language:EN
[2015/40]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3126958
Date:08.02.2017
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015
[2017/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3126958
Date:23.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.10.2015
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.10.2017
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/16, G06F7/04
[2017/45]
Former International [2017/06]G06F7/04
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETEKTION EINES KOPIERTEN COMPUTERCODES MIT FINGERABDRÜCKEN[2017/06]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DETECTING COPIED COMPUTER CODE USING FINGERPRINTS[2017/06]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION LA COPIE DE CODE MACHINE AU MOYEN D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES[2018/37]
Former [2017/06]SYSTEMES ET PROCEDES POUR LA DETECTION LA COPIE DE CODE MACHINE AU MOYEN D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES
Entry into regional phase20.09.2016National basic fee paid 
20.09.2016Search fee paid 
20.09.2016Designation fee(s) paid 
20.09.2016Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.01.2016Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
20.09.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.09.2016Examination requested  [2017/06]
20.09.2016Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.08.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2018Fee for grant paid
05.12.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.12.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)24.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.03.2017Renewal fee patent year 03
13.03.2018Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL23.01.2019
AT23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
IE26.03.2019
LU26.03.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
[2020/09]
Former [2020/03]AL23.01.2019
AT23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
LU26.03.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/52]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
LU26.03.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/51]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
SM23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AL23.01.2019
CZ23.01.2019
DK23.01.2019
EE23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RO23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
SK23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/48]DK23.01.2019
ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/46]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
IT23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
MC23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
HR23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
LV23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
RS23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
IS23.05.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
BG23.04.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
GR24.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES23.01.2019
FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
PL23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
SE23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI23.01.2019
LT23.01.2019
NO23.04.2019
PT23.05.2019
Documents cited:Search[A]US2014006375  (FORTE ANDREA G [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; claim 3 *;
 [A]US2013036129  (HAVEL IVAN [CZ], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0011] - [0015] - [0045] - [0050]; claim 12 *;
 [A]  - M.L. Kammer, "Plagiarism detection in Haskell programs using call graph matching", Utrecht University, Master's thesis, (20110601), pages 1 - 87, URL: www.staff.science.uu.nl/~hage0101/msctheses/mamixkammer-msc.pdf, (20151118), XP055229203 [A] 1-13 * pages 45-49 *
International search[Y]US2014006375  (FORTE ANDREA G [US], et al) [Y] 5, 26 * (para [0018], [0046]) *;
 [Y]  - LIM et al., "A method for detecting the theft of Java programs through analysis of the control flow informafion.", information and Software Technology, vol. 51., (20090000), URL: http://plus.kaist.ac.kr/~han/IST2009Sep.pdf, (20150612), XP026237478 [Y] 1-6, 14-21, 26-27 * entire document especially (pg. 1340, col. 2; pg. 1343, col. 2; pg. 1345, col. 2; pg. 1349, col. 1) *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.infsof.2009.04.011
 [Y]  - CHOI et al., "A Static Birthmark of Binary Executables Based on API Call Structure.", Berlin Heidelberg, (20070000), page 3, 8, and 9, URL: http://plus.kaist.ac.kr/~han/ASIAN07.pdf, (20150612), XP019083910 [Y] 14-21, and 26-27
 [Y]  - KAMMER., "Plagiarism detection in Haskell programs using call graph matching.", (20110500), page 49, URL: http://www.staff.science.uu.nl/~hage0101/msctheses/mamixkammer-msc.pdf, (20150612), XP055229203 [Y] 1-6, 16, 18, 21
 [Y]  - HANCOCK., "Graph matching using adjacency matrix Markov chains.", Proc. 3rd Int. Workshop EMMCVPR., (20010101), page 1, 3 and 4, URL: http://webcache.googleusercontent.com/search?q=cache:ZubbnEzFIOMJ:http//www.academiaedu/1202944/Graph_matching_using_adjacency_matnx_Markov_chains%2BGraph+matching+using+adjacency+matrix+hancock+Proc.+3rd+Int.+Workshop+EMMCVPR&hl=en&gbv=2&&ct=(Ink, (20150615), XP055229209 [Y] 1-6, 17, 18